Reports for Pipistrello
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pipistrello
- Pipistrello has its legal headquarters in Rikon im Tösstal and is active. It operates in the sector «Other services: entertainment and recreation».
- The management of the organization Pipistrello consists of 8 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 06.06.2003.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 23.02.2024.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-110.085.263.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Daniel Hermann Meier,
Thea Seitz,
Renate Julia von Rickenbach,
Salomé Roswitha Fässler,
Lukas Adrian Rübel
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Hermann Meier,
Thea Seitz,
Renate Julia von Rickenbach,
Lukas Adrian Rübel,
Roland Scheibler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.06.2003
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zell (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.070-8
UID/VAT
CHE-110.085.263
Sector
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung und Bekanntmachung von Zirkus und Animationszirkus, sowie weitere daraus hervorgehende Unternehmungen. Animationsarbeit in Schulen, Bildungs- und Freizeitstätten jeglicher Art, sowie in Alters- oder Behindertenheimen bilden die Hauptaufgabe. Losgelöst vom Leistungsdenken und den damit verbundenen Anforderungen werden auf spielerische Weise vorhandenes Können, Wünsche, Fantasien und Ideen gefördert und gestützt. Hierfür dient das wöchentliche Erarbeiten einer Zirkusvorstellung, oder andere ähnlich gestaltete Aufführungen. Die Stiftung verfolgt keine kommerziellen Zwecke und erstrebt keinen Gewinn. Die Stiftung ist national tätig.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Götz & Rufer Treuhand AG | Stein am Rhein | 23.02.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revigroup Zürich AG in Liquidation | Zürich | 18.12.2017 | 22.02.2024 | |
Treuhandbüro Norbert Hutter AG | Elgg | 08.12.2008 | 17.12.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pipistrello
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005968807, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pipistrello, in Zell (ZH), CHE-110.085.263, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 25.05.2023, Publ. 1005753380).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Matzenmüller Rivola, Daniel, von Zürich, in Bremgarten bei Bern, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Revigroup Zürich AG (CHE-112.503.142), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Rickenbach, Renate Julia, von Arth, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Meier, Daniel Hermann, von Baden, in Zell (ZH), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Seitz, Thea, von Zürich, in Reinach (BL), Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Götz & Rufer Treuhand AG (CHE-106.928.450), in Stein am Rhein, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005753380, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pipistrello, in Zell (ZH), CHE-110.085.263, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2022, Publ. 1005381797).
Urkundenänderung:
03.04.2023.
Publication number: HR02-1005381797, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pipistrello, in Zell (ZH), CHE-110.085.263, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 228 vom 25.11.2019, Publ. 1004766750).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Budliger, Michael, von Küsnacht ZH, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Achermann, Caroline Jane, von Oberkirch, in Horgen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Jaussi, Volker, von Basel, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rübel, Lukas Adrian, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meier, Daniel Hermann, von Baden, in Zell (ZH), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fässler, Salomé Roswitha, von Appenzell, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.