Reports for Pier 1 AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pier 1 AG
- Pier 1 AG in Brunnen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of restaurants». Pier 1 AG is active.
- The company was founded on 15.03.2022.
- The last commercial register change was made on 26.04.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- Pier 1 AG is registered in the Canton of SZ under the UID CHE-491.496.536.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Quai 2 AG, Travelpoint Müller.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.03.2022
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ingenbohl
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.3.030.783-1
UID/VAT
CHE-491.496.536
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung von Gastrobetrieben und damit zusammenhängende Dienstleistungen, sowie den Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Patente errichten, erwerben und veräussern, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pier 1 AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006018763, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Pier 1 AG, in Ingenbohl, CHE-491.496.536, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 18.03.2022, Publ. 1005430221).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schöpfer, André, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Ingenbohl, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR01-1005430221, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Pier 1 AG, in Ingenbohl, CHE-491.496.536, Waldstätterquai 2, 6440 Brunnen, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
09.03.2022.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung von Gastrobetrieben und damit zusammenhängende Dienstleistungen, sowie den Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Patente errichten, erwerben und veräussern, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 102'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 102'000.00.
Aktien:
102 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 09.03.2022 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Müller, Adrian, von Altdorf (UR), in Ingenbohl, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schöpfer, André, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Ingenbohl, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
von Reding, Aloys, von Schwyz, in Ingenbohl, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.