Reports for picobello studio sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout picobello studio sàrl
- picobello studio sàrl has its legal headquarters in Vevey and is active. It operates in the sector «Photography, Operation of photo labs».
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 23.02.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-172.094.839.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.08.2018
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Vevey
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-645.4.118.190-7
UID/VAT
CHE-172.094.839
Sector
Photography, Operation of photo labs
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un studio de photographie et production d'images, ainsi que toutes activités dans le domaine des arts plastiques et de la publicité. Prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption: selon statuts.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: picobello studio sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005969726, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
picobello studio sàrl, à Vevey, CHE-172.094.839 (FOSC du 30.11.2023, p. 0/1005898040). Genta Nicolas Edoardo Roger est nommé président.
Nouvelle gérante:
Carrel Eve, de Misery-Courtion, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005898040, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
picobello studio sàrl, à Vevey, CHE-172.094.839 (FOSC du 02.02.2023, p. 0/1005668627). Arpin Pauline Pascale Liliane, qui n'est plus associée-gérante et dont la signature est radiée;
cède ses 100 parts de CHF 100 à l'associé Genta Nicolas Edoardo Roger, nommé gérant, qui signe désormais individuellement, désormais titulaire de 200 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: HR02-1005668627, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
picobello studio sàrl, à Vevey, CHE-172.094.839 (FOSC du 15.02.2021, p. 0/1005101162). Statuts modifiés le 24.01.2023. L'associé Genta Nicolas Edoardo Roger n'est plus gérant;
sa signature est radiée. Arpin Pauline Pascale Liliane n'est plus présidente et signe désormais individuellement.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.