Address
c/o Commune de Conthey
Route de Savoie 54
1975 St-Séverin
Reports for Phytoark SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Phytoark SA
- Phytoark SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in St-Séverin. Phytoark SA belongs to the industry «Research and development» and is currently active.
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 09.07.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-109.886.902.
Management (5)
newest board members
Gautier Moulin,
Philippe Christian Henri Varone,
Cyrille Jean Claude Fauchère,
Yves Christophe Germanier,
Sergio Marco Schmid
newest authorized signatories
Gautier Moulin,
Philippe Christian Henri Varone,
Cyrille Jean Claude Fauchère,
Yves Christophe Germanier,
Sergio Marco Schmid
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.01.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Conthey
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.007.898-6
UID/VAT
CHE-109.886.902
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour mission d'être un centre de compétence pour le développement de produits à partir de cellules végétales intactes ou de molécules extraites de ces cellules. Toutes les plantes, qu'il s'agisse de plantes médicinales et aromatiques, de fruits et légumes, de même que celles susceptibles de présenter un intérêt pour les secteurs agroalimentaires, cosmétique et pharmaceutique entrent en considération. La société réunit les éléments-clés suivants : 1. des PME 2. des centres de compétences, instituts, etc. 3. des centres R & D d'industries 4. une pépinière d'entreprises; gestion commerciale, administrative et technique de ses bâtiments et infrastructures; elle peut effectuer toutes les opérations en relation directe ou indirecte avec sa mission.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Berney Associés Valais SA | Sion | 09.07.2021 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ECSA Fiduciaire SA | Sion | <2004 | 08.07.2021 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Phytopôle alpin SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Phytoark SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005245797, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Phytoark SA, à Sion, CHE-109.886.902, société anonyme (No. FOSC 94 du 18.05.2021, Publ. 1005185319).
Modification des statuts:
15.06.2021.
Nouveau siège:
Conthey.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Commune de Conthey, Route de Savoie 54, 1975 St-Séverin.
Nouvelles communications:
Communication aux actionnaires: par courrier ou par courriel.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Perruchoud, Dominique, de Chalais, à Chalais, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président;
Volpi Fournier, Marylène , de Mont-Noble, à Sion, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux avec le président;
ECSA Fiduciaire SA (CH-626.3.003.754-0), à Sion, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Moulin, Gautier, de Val de Bagnes, à Conthey, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président;
Varone, Philippe, de Sion, à Sion, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président;
Lathion Berney & Associés SA (CHE-108.469.884), à Sion, organe de révision. [Modification des statuts sur des points non soumis à publication].
Publication number: HR02-1005185319, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Phytoark SA, à Sion, CHE-109.886.902, société anonyme (No. FOSC 27 du 10.02.2020, Publ. 1004826520).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bitschnau, Christian , de Sion, à Sion, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Germanier, Yves Christophe, dit Christophe, de Conthey, à Conthey, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: vice-président, avec signature collective à deux avec le président];
Fauchère, Cyrille, de Sion, à Sion, vice-président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec le président [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président];
Volpi Fournier, Marylène , de Mont-Noble, à Sion, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Publication number: HR02-1004826520, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Phytoark SA, à Sion, CHE-109.886.902, société anonyme (No. FOSC 224 du 17.11.2017, Publ. 3877141).
Autres adresses:
Route des Eterpys 22, 1964 Conthey.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.