Address
c/o Urs Benkler
Efringerweg 3
4143 Dornach
Reports for Peter's Crêpes GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Peter's Crêpes GmbH
- Peter's Crêpes GmbH is currently active and the industry «Management of restaurants». The legal headquarters are in Dornach.
- The management of the company Peter's Crêpes GmbH consists of 2 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 11.12.2015.
- The company Peter's Crêpes GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-112.718.731.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.01.2006
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Dornach
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.4.005.516-2
UID/VAT
CHE-112.718.731
Sector
Management of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb von Verpflegungsstätten, welche vorwiegend Crêpes und Langos produzieren und anbieten. Kann im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Grundstücke erwerben sowie alles unternehmen, was den Zweck der Gesellschaft fördert.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Peter's Crêpes GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2534421, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Peter's Crêpes GmbH, in Dornach, CHE-112.718.731, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 12.06.2009, Publ. 5065602).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stockmar, Peter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Ingersheim (DE), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stockmar, Zsuzsanna, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Ingersheim (DE), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 9'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 9'000.00].
Publication number: 5065602, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Peter's Crêpes GmbH, in Dornach, CH-241.4.005.516-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2006, S. 16, Publ. 3200738). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 09.05.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft der ordentlichen Revision nicht und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Benkler, Urs, von Basel, in Dornach, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.-- [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer].
Publication number: 3200738, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Peter's Crêpes GmbH, in Dornach, CH-241.4.005.516-2, bei Urs Benkler, Efringerweg 3, 4143 Dornach, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
10.01.2006.
Zweck:
Betrieb von Verpflegungsstätten, welche vorwiegend Crêpes und Langos produzieren und anbieten. Kann im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Grundstücke erwerben sowie alles unternehmen, was den Zweck der Gesellschaft fördert.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Eingetragene Personen:
Benkler, Urs, von Basel, in Dornach, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--;
Stockmar, Peter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Ingersheim (DE), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 10'000.--;
Stockmar, Zsuzsanna, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Ingersheim (DE), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 9'000.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.