Address
Chemin de la Gravière 14
1225 Chêne-Bourg
Reports for Pes SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pes SA
- Pes SA with its legal headquarters in Chêne-Bourg is active. Pes SA operates in the sector «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles».
- Pes SA was founded on 19.03.1992.
- The last commercial register change was made on 10.05.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.571.216.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: AXEA Sàrl, RS Plus Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.03.1992
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Chêne-Bourg
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.274.992-0
UID/VAT
CHE-103.571.216
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation d'une entreprise de carrosserie. Elle peut faire, soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, mobilières ou immobilières se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but social et s'intéresser, sous toutes formes, à toutes entreprises similaires. La société peut également constituer des succursales et des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Heller S.A. | Nyon | 29.04.2010 | 11.01.2015 | |
Tiger Management SA | Gland | 29.09.2006 | 28.04.2010 | |
Fica SA | Carouge (GE) | <2004 | 28.09.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pes SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005743379, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Pes SA, à Chêne-Bourg, CHE-103.571.216 (FOSC du 26.07.2021, p. 0/1005258023).
Nouveau but:
l'exploitation d'une entreprise de carrosserie. Elle peut faire, soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, mobilières ou immobilières se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but social et s'intéresser, sous toutes formes, à toutes entreprises similaires. La société peut également constituer des succursales et des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger. Le 01.05.2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives;
par décision de l'assemblée générale du 27.04.2023, les statuts de la société ont été adaptés à la conversion;
les actions sont désormais liées selon statuts.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 100'000, divisé en 50 actions de CHF 2'000, nominatives, liées selon statuts.
Communication aux actionnaires:
lettre recommandée, courriel ou téléfax. Nouveaux statuts du 27.04.2023. Keller Aeby Rose-Maria Monica, Buttex Cédric, et de Trentinian Jean Edgar ne sont plus administrateurs;
leurs pouvoirs sont radiés.
Administration:
Rotthier Stéphane, de et à Meinier, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005258023, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Pes SA, à Chêne-Bourg, CHE-103.571.216 (FOSC du 26.05.2020, p. 0/1004897348). Le 01.05.2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives. Les statuts de la société n'ont pas encore été adaptés à la conversion, mais devront l'être lors de la prochaine modification.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 100'000, divisé en 50 actions de CHF 2'000, nominatives.
Publication number: HR02-1004897348, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Pes SA, à Chêne-Bourg, CHE-103.571.216 (FOSC du 12.01.2015, p. 0/1922339).
Administration:
Keller Aeby Rose-Maria Monica, de Erlen, à Thônex, présidente avec signature individuelle, de Trentinian Jean Edgar, nommé délégué, et Buttex Cédric, de Valbroye, à Coppet, secrétaire, lesquels signent collectivement à deux;
les pouvoirs de Trentinian Jean Edgar sont modifiés en ce sens.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.