Reports for Pervenire GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pervenire GmbH
- Pervenire GmbH in Zürich is a Limited liability company from the sector «Recruiting agency services». Pervenire GmbH is active.
- The management of the company Pervenire GmbH, which was founded on the 19.12.2019, consists of 2 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 29.12.2020.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-256.055.089.
- On the same address there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: Bejoo AG, Payerpoint Floria Payer, RESUS Immobilien AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.12.2019
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-150.4.477.155-3
UID/VAT
CHE-256.055.089
Sector
Recruiting agency services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung von Kunden im Bereich Human Resources, insbesondere Personalvermittlung, Coaching, Mentoring und weitere Dienstleistungen in diesem Zusammenhang. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pervenire GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005060924, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Pervenire GmbH, in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-256.055.089, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 27.11.2020, Publ. 1005033335). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Zürich im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Nidwalden von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005060586, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pervenire GmbH, bisher in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-256.055.089, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 27.11.2020, Publ. 1005033335).
Statutenänderung:
17.12.2020.
Sitz neu:
Zürich.
Domizil neu:
Allenmoosstrasse 9, 8057 Zürich.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schwarz, Jean-Jacques Henry, von Stallikon, in Effingen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Luzern].
Publication number: HR02-1005033335, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Pervenire GmbH, in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-256.055.089, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 24.02.2020, Publ. 1004837034).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baldauf, Berhard Albert, von Luzern, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Kuoni, Maria Elisabeth, von Maienfeld, in Hergiswil (NW), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bornhauser, Ralph Dieter, von Weinfelden, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Schwarz, Jean-Jacques Henry, von Stallikon, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.