Reports for Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG
- Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG in Gais is a Foundation from the sector «Operation of an pension fund». Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG is active.
- Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG has 5 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.04.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG is the following: CHE-109.776.343.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: Dähler Gartenunterhalt GmbH, Fürsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller A.G. Aetzerei, Färberei, Appretur, Gais, Hermann Koller AG Ätzerei, Färberei, Appretur, Gais.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Andrea Gächter Preisig,
Verena Winkler,
Nico Fässler,
Peter Baumberger
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.11.1986
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Gais
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-300.7.011.233-4
UID/VAT
CHE-109.776.343
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Berufliche Vorsorge im Rahmen des BVG für die Arbeitnehmer der Firma sowie für deren Angehörige und Hinterlassenen gegen wirtschaftliche Folgen von Alter, Tod und Invalidität.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dr. Rietmann & Partner AG, Wirtschaftsprüfer und Steuerberater | St. Gallen | 12.04.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
IDP Treuhand AG | Gais | 10.04.2007 | 11.04.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- BVG Vorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG, Gais
- BVG Vorsorgestiftung der Firma Koller Hermann AG, Gais
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005721755, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG, in Gais, CHE-109.776.343, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 14.07.2022, Publ. 1005520900).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
IDP Treuhand AG (CHE-107.361.959), in Gais, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dr. Rietmann & Partner AG, Wirtschaftsprüfer und Steuerberater (CHE-102.084.882), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005520900, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG, in Gais, CHE-109.776.343, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 22.02.2022, Publ. 1005411511).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Waldmeier, Daniel, von Möhlin, in Gais, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Cetinkaya, Hülya, von Arbon, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fässler, Nico, von Walperswil, in Teufen (AR), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Gächter Preisig, Andrea, von Oberriet (SG), in Rehetobel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Winkler, Verena, von Sennwald, in Gais, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005411511, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Firma Hermann Koller AG, in Gais, CHE-109.776.343, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2019, Publ. 1004683076).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fuster, Astrid, von Rebstein, in Rebstein, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fässler, Nico, von Walperswil, in Teufen (AR), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.