Reports for Personalfürsorgestiftung des Kinderheims Bachtelen Grenchen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Personalfürsorgestiftung des Kinderheims Bachtelen Grenchen
- Personalfürsorgestiftung des Kinderheims Bachtelen Grenchen has its legal headquarters in Grenchen, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of an pension fund».
- The organization was founded on 31.12.1966.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 27.01.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register SO under the UID CHE-110.379.374.
- There are 3 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Mazzinistiftung Grenchen, Stiftung der Freunde des Kinderheims Bachtelen Grenchen, Verein Bachtelen Kinderheime und Sonderschulen.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Karl Diethelm-Wolfisberg,
Gustav Jgnatius Maria Keune,
Marcel Probst,
Andreas Joseph Christoph Kummer,
Thomas Frey-Reichert
newest authorized signatories
Karl Diethelm-Wolfisberg,
Gustav Jgnatius Maria Keune,
Marcel Probst,
Andreas Joseph Christoph Kummer,
Thomas Frey-Reichert
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.12.1966
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Grenchen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-254.7.000.265-0
UID/VAT
CHE-110.379.374
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fürsorge für die Angestellten des Stifters sowie für deren Hinterbliebenen im Falle von Alter, Krankheit, Invalidität, Tod und unverschuldeter Notlage.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Grenchen | 07.02.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Personalfürsorgestiftung des Kinderheims Bachtelen Grenchen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005084777, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Personalfürsorgestiftung des Kinderheims Bachtelen Grenchen, in Grenchen, CHE-110.379.374, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2018, Publ. 4023445).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Crivelli, Carlo, von Grenchen, in Grenchen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Diethelm, Dr. Karl, von Galgenen, in Grenchen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Keune, Gustav, von Tentlingen, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 4023445, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Personalfürsorgestiftung des Kinderheims Bachtelen Grenchen, in Grenchen, CHE-110.379.374, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 171 vom 04.09.2015, Publ. 2357173).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht des Kantons Aargau, in Aarau.
Publication number: 2357173, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Personalfürsorgestiftung des Kinderheims Bachtelen Grenchen, in Grenchen, CHE-110.379.374, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2011, Publ. 6211438).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht, in Solothurn.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keune, Gustav, von Tentlingen, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.