Reports for Personalfürsorgestiftung der Sanitär Material AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Personalfürsorgestiftung der Sanitär Material AG
- Personalfürsorgestiftung der Sanitär Material AG from Kriens 2 operates in the sector «Operation of an pension fund» and is active.
- The organization was founded on 10.01.1948 and has 4 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 01.06.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Personalfürsorgestiftung der Sanitär Material AG is the following: CHE-109.372.129.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.01.1948
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.009.439-8
UID/VAT
CHE-109.372.129
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vorsorge für die Mitarbeiter der Stifterfirma und die Mitarbeiter von ihr nahestehenden Unternehmen sowie für deren Angehörige und Hinterlassene zur wirtschaftlichen Sicherung bei Alter, Invalidität, Tod und zur Linderung unverschuldeter Notlagen; Zuwendungen an andere, dem Stiftungszweck dienende, steuerbefreite Vorsorgeeinrichtungen, denen die Stifterfirma oder ihr nahestehende Unternehmen angeschlossen sind; insbesondere können auch reglementarische Arbeitgeberbeiträge im Rahmen der genannten Vorsorgeeinrichtung finanziert werden.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 02.07.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Personalfürsorgestiftung der Sanitär Material AG, Luzern
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Personalfürsorgestiftung der Sanitär Material AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005757858, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Sanitär Material AG, in Kriens, CHE-109.372.129, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 20.07.2021, Publ. 1005253255).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Henzelin, Catherine, von Biel/Bienne, in Belmont-sur-Lausanne, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wiederkehr, Caroline, von Bünzen und Aarau, in Seon, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005253255, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Sanitär Material AG, in Kriens, CHE-109.372.129, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 157 vom 14.08.2020, Publ. 1004957818).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Biadici, Mirko, von Lavizzara, in Bellinzona, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Moor, Ralph, von Brittnau, in Winkel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004957818, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Sanitär Material AG, in Kriens, CHE-109.372.129, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 14.08.2019, Publ. 1004695539).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Knüsli Amacker, Markus, von Zürich, in Sion, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Henzelin, Catherine, von Biel/Bienne, in Belmont-sur-Lausanne, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Biadici, Mirko, von Lavizzara, in Bellinzona, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.