Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Personalfürsorgestiftung der Niederberger + Co. AG und der Niederberger Schleif- + Polierautomaten AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.12.1967
Deletion from the commercial register
07.05.2012
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.008.660-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.794.252
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausserobligatorische (vor-, unter- und überobligatorische) berufliche Vorsorge für die Arbeitnehmerinnen und Arbeitnehmer der Firmen Niederberger + Co. AG, in Kriens, und Niederberger Schleif- und Polierautomaten AG, in Kriens, sowie deren Angehörigen und Hinterlassenen gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Tod und Invalidität; Ausrichtung von Unterstützungsleistungen in Notlagen an die erwähnten Vorsorgenehmer wie bei Krankheit, Unfall, Invalidität oder Arbeitslosigkeit; Finanzierung von Beiträgen und Versicherungsprämien an andere steuerbefreite Vorsorgeeinrichtungen, die zugunsten der Destinatäre bestehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG | Kriens | 13.07.2006 | 06.05.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Personalfürsorgestiftung der Niederberger & Co AG, Kriens
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Personalfürsorgestiftung der Niederberger + Co. AG und der Niederberger Schleif- + Polierautomaten AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6665978, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Niederberger + Co. AG und der Niederberger Schleif- + Polierautomaten AG, in Kriens, CH-100.7.008.660-9, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2006, S. 9, Publ. 3463428). Mit Verfügung vom 29.11.2011 hat die Zentralschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (ZBSA) festgestellt, dass die Stiftung aufgrund von Art. 88 Abs. 1 ZGB aufgehoben ist. Sie ist daher im Handelsregister zu löschen.
Publication number: 3463428, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Niederberger + Co. AG und der Niederberger Schleif- + Polierautomaten AG, in Kriens, CH-100.7.008.660-9, Ausserobligatorische (vor-, unter- und überobligatorische) berufliche Vorsorge für die Arbeitnehmerinnen und Arbeitnehmer der Firmen Niederberger + Co, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 17.06.2005, S. 8, Publ. 2886820).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Zentralschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (ZBSA).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG, in Kriens, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2886820, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Niederberger + Co. AG und der Niederberger Schleif- + Polierautomaten AG, in Kriens, CH-100.7.008.660-9, Ausserobligatorische (vor-, unter- und überobligatorische) berufliche Vorsorge für die Arbeitnehmerinnen und Arbeitnehmer der Firmen Niederberger + Co, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 08.06.2001, S. 4326).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Durrer, Isidor, von Kerns, in Hergiswil NW (An), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Arbeitgebervertreter (Ag).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stöckli, Peter, von Sursee und Muri AG, in Sursee (An), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Arbeitgebervertreter (Ag).