Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Head office
Other branches (1)
Reports for Perrin & Spaeth bureau d'ingénieurs électriciens SA, succursale de Nyon
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.03.1987
Deletion from the commercial register
24.05.2006
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Nyon
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.142.820-3
UID/VAT
CHE-371.144.370
Sector
no information known
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Bureau d'ing., conseils d. le dom. de l'électricité, etc
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Perrin & Spaeth bureau d'ingénieurs électriciens SA, succursale de Borex
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Perrin & Spaeth bureau d'ingénieurs électriciens SA, succursale de Nyon
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3389800, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Perrin & Spaeth bureau d'ingénieurs électriciens S.A., succursale de Nyon, à Nyon, CH-550-0142820-3 (FOSC du 13.10.2004, p. 15).
Siège principal:
Lausanne. La raison sociale est radiée par suite de suppression de la succursale.
Publication number: 2491010, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Perrin & Spaeth bureau d'ingénieurs électriciens S.A., succursale de Nyon, à Nyon, CH-550-0142820-3 (FOSC du 06.07.1995, p. 3805).
Siège principal:
Lausanne. La signature de Perrin Charles-Denis est radiée. Spaeth Christian désormais à Nyon, qui n'est plus secrétaire, reste administrateur et continue à signer collectivement à deux. La succursale est également engagée par la signature collective à deux des administrateurs Marville Michel, de et à Lausanne, président, et La Luna Joseph, d'Italie, à Valeyres-sous-Rances, vice-président et secrétaire.
Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Perrin & Spaeth bureau d'ingénieurs électriciens S.A., succursale de Borex, à Borex (FOSC du 19.3.1987, p.1072), avec siège principal à Lausanne. La succursale a été transférée à Nyon, chemin du Chêne5.
sous la raison sociale:
Perrin & Spaeth bureau d'ingénieurs électriciens S.A., succursale de Nyon.