Reports for Perltex AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Perltex AG
- Perltex AG is currently active and the industry «Cleaning of buildings». The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- The company was founded on 06.03.1952.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 04.09.2019, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Perltex AG is the following: CHE-105.804.153.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Angel Puebla,
Manuela Emilie Puebla,
Vanessa Celine Ventura Lopez
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.03.1952
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.011.721-2
UID/VAT
CHE-105.804.153
Sector
Cleaning of buildings
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Reinigungsaufträgen aller Art sowie Beratung in diesen Fragen und Handel mit einschlägigen Artikeln; Beteiligungen; Vornahme von Finanzierungen; Erwerb, Veräusserung, Verwaltung und Belastung von und Handel mit Liegenschaften.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alpina Treuhand AG | Hergiswil (NW) | 04.09.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
sigura treuhand GmbH | Luzern | 10.10.2008 | 03.09.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Perltex AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004708685, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Perltex AG, in Luzern, CHE-105.804.153, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2018, Publ. 4362883).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
sigura treuhand GmbH (CHE-112.027.288), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Alpina Treuhand AG (CHE-106.904.389), in Hergiswil (NW), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4362883, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Perltex AG, in Luzern, CHE-105.804.153, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 17.12.2015, Publ. 2545753).
Domizil neu:
Horwerstrasse 83, 6005 Luzern.
Publication number: 2545753, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Perltex AG., in Luzern, CHE-105.804.153, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 10.10.2008, S. 9, Publ. 4685974).
Statutenänderung:
09.12.2015.
Firma neu:
Perltex AG.
Zweck neu:
Ausführung von Reinigungsaufträgen aller Art sowie Beratung in diesen Fragen und Handel mit einschlägigen Artikeln;
Beteiligungen;
Vornahme von Finanzierungen;
Erwerb, Veräusserung, Verwaltung und Belastung von und Handel mit Liegenschaften.
Aktien neu:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00. [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Butz, Christel, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Horw, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
sigura treuhand GmbH (CHE-112.027.288), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: sigura treuhand GmbH, in Luzern (CH-150.4.000.790-7)];
Puebla, Manuela Emilie, von Hasle LU, in Oberdorf NW, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ventura Lopez, Vanessa Celine, von Hasle LU, in Oberdorf NW, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.