Reports for Paul Morard et Fils S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Paul Morard et Fils S.A.
- Paul Morard et Fils S.A. has its legal headquarters in Le Bry, is active and operates in the sector «Beverage production (with alcohol)».
- Paul Morard et Fils S.A. was founded on 01.05.1978.
- The last commercial register change was made on 21.07.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company Paul Morard et Fils S.A. is registered under the UID CHE-107.769.591.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.05.1978
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Pont-en-Ogoz
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.430.484-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.769.591
Sector
Beverage production (with alcohol)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
exploiter une distillerie et cidrerie, ainsi que le commerce d'eaux-de-vie et spiritueux, et en général de toutes boissons alcooliques et non-alcooliques.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Ruffieux S.A. | Bulle | 10.12.2001 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Paul Morard et Fils SA
- Morard Paul & Fils SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Paul Morard et Fils S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005254427, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Paul Morard et Fils S.A., à Pont-en-Ogoz, CHE-107.769.591 (SHAB vom 28.05.2021, s. 0/1005196086).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Morard Georges Fernand, administrateur, signature individuelle, maintenant administrateur, président, signature individuelle.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Pugin Valentin, de Riaz, à Pont-en-Ogoz, administrateur, secrétaire, signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005196086, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Paul Morard et Fils S.A., à Pont-en-Ogoz, CHE-107.769.591 (FOSC du 05.04.2019, p. 0/1004604241). Le 01.05.2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives. Les statuts de la société n'ont pas encore été adaptés à la conversion, mais devront l'être lors de la prochaine modification.
Capital-actions nouveau:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives (jusqu'ici: 100 actions de CHF 1'000, au porteur).
Publication number: HR02-1004604241, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Paul Morard et Fils S.A., à Pont-en-Ogoz, CHE-107.769.591 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826).
Adresse précise:
Route de Villars d'Avry 62, 1645 Le Bry.
Personne radiée:
Morard Bernard, administrateur président, signature individuelle.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Morard Georges, administrateur secrétaire, signature individuelle, nom précis Morard Georges Fernand, maintenant administrateur, signature individuelle, désormais de et à Pont-en-Ogoz (fusion de commune).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.