Reports for Pasqual-Stefano SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pasqual-Stefano SA
- Pasqual-Stefano SA has its legal headquarters in Genève and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Other construction».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 03.08.2021, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Pasqual-Stefano SA is registered under the UID CHE-107.740.819.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.11.1960
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.981.987-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.740.819
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un atelier et magasin de vitrerie, miroiterie, encadrements, pose, réparation et fabrication de stores.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Norman Auditing SA | Genève | 13.09.2019 | 02.12.2019 | |
ORFA Audit SA, succursale de Genève | Genève | 29.12.2008 | 23.07.2019 | |
Gespower SA | Carouge (GE) | <2004 | 28.12.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pasqual-Stefano SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005263973, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Pasqual-Stefano SA, à Genève, CHE-107.740.819 (FOSC du 04.08.2020, p. 0/1004951646). Guillermard Thierry est maintenant domicilié à Annemasse, FRA. Faoro Yvan, de et à Meyrin, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004951646, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Pasqual-Stefano SA, à Genève, CHE-107.740.819 (FOSC du 03.12.2019, p. 0/1004774032). Maggi Christophe n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés.
Administation:
Guillermard Thierry, nommé président et Grosjean Jacques, de France, à Messery, FRA, tous deux avec signature individuelle;
les pouvoirs de Guillermard Thierry sont modifiés en ce sens.
Publication number: HR02-1004774032, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Pasqual-Stefano SA, à Genève, CHE-107.740.819 (FOSC du 13.09.2019, p. 0/1004716227). La clause statutaire relative à l'apport en nature effectué lors de la constitution est abrogée, conformément à l'article 628 alinéa 4 CO.
Communication aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Nouveaux statuts du 11.06.2019. UIS-United Investors Services SA (CHE-102.276.134) n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 11.06.2019, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.