Reports for Park Studio AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Park Studio AG
- Park Studio AG has its legal headquarters in Dielsdorf, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of design, graphics and jewellery studios».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 28.06.2016.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 03.11.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-174.997.899.
- The address is identical with 15 other active companies. These include: ABBA Bauunternehmung GmbH, Adepta Schweiz GmbH, Alili GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.06.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dielsdorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.441.381-2
UID/VAT
CHE-174.997.899
Sector
Operation of design, graphics and jewellery studios
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Produktion, Verarbeitung, Handel und Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Fotografie, Fotofinishing, Bildveredelung und visuelle Kommunikation, Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Kommunikation und Informatik, insbesondere Beratung, Konzeption, Design und Realisation von Projekten im Bereich neue Medien, Internet, Multimedia und weitere elektronische Medien sowie Erbringung von Beratungsleistungen auf dem Gebiet der Informationstechnologie, Datenverarbeitung, Hosting und damit verbundenen Tätigkeiten; kann Werbedienstleistungen erbringen, sich mit Erwerb, Verwaltung, Verwertung und gewerblicher Nutzung von Lizenzen, Urheberrechten, Patenten und anderen Schutzrechten befassen, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen, Darlehen aufnehmen und gewähren sowie Garantien und andere Sicherheiten stellen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
May-Treuhand AG | Muttenz | 06.10.2020 | 02.11.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Park Studio AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005875901, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Park Studio AG, in Dielsdorf, CHE-174.997.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 10.05.2023, Publ. 1005742506). Gemäss Erklärung vom 16.10.2023 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
May-Treuhand AG (CHE-107.796.843), in Muttenz, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005743071, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Park Studio AG, in Möhlin, CHE-174.997.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2020, Publ. 1004993743). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Dielsdorf im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Aargau von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005742506, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Park Studio AG, bisher in Möhlin, CHE-174.997.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2020, Publ. 1004993743).
Statutenänderung:
25.04.2023.
Sitz neu:
Dielsdorf.
Domizil neu:
Honeywell-Platz 1, 8157 Dielsdorf.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meyer, Urs, von Zürich, in Freienbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.