Reports for Pariat Frères S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pariat Frères S.A.
- Pariat Frères S.A. has its legal headquarters in Crassier and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Other construction».
- The management of the company Pariat Frères S.A. consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 26.05.1989.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 03.02.2021.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Pariat Frères S.A. is the following: CHE-106.973.663.
- There are 3 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Carrié.Philippe Sàrl, Pariat Ansermet Sàrl, TSIC SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Crassier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.108.600-8
UID/VAT
CHE-106.973.663
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une entreprise d'installations sanitaires, d'appareillage, de ferblanterie et de couverture.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
MOORE STEPHENS REFIDAR SA | Nyon | 28.02.2012 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bureau Fiduciaire Lerch SA en liquidation | Nyon | 02.05.2011 | 27.02.2012 | |
Bureau Fiduciaire C.-A. Cherpillod | Gland | <2004 | 01.05.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Pariat Frères SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pariat Frères S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005091107, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Pariat Frères S.A., à Crassier, CHE-106.973.663 (FOSC du 24.02.2015, p. 0/2006991). La signature de Pariat Roger est radiée.
Publication number: 2006991, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Pariat Frères S.A., à Crassier, CHE-106.973.663 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Nouvelle adresse:
chemin des Brumes 4, 1263 Crassier.
Publication number: 6572670, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Pariat Frères S.A., à Crassier, CH-550-0108600-8, exploitation d'une entreprise d'installations sanitaires, d'appareillage, de ferblanterie et de couverture (FOSC du 02.05.2011, p. 0/6143452). Pariat Pierre-Alain n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Pariat Roger, qui n'est plus administrateur, est nommé directeur et continue à signer individuellement.
Nouveaux administrateurs avec signature individuelle:
Joray Didier, de et à Gingins, président, et Pariat Richard, de Borex, à Crassier, secrétaire. Bureau Fiduciaire Lerch SA (CH-550-1029844-7) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
MOORE STEPHENS REFIDAR SA (CH-550-1022835-9), à Nyon.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.