Address
Schäflistrasse 1
9430 St. Margrethen SG
Reports for Parcellino Versandmanagement GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Parcellino Versandmanagement GmbH
- Parcellino Versandmanagement GmbH is currently active and the industry «Other transportation services». The legal headquarters are in St. Margrethen SG.
- The management of the company Parcellino Versandmanagement GmbH consists of 2 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 17.01.2024.
- Parcellino Versandmanagement GmbH is registered in the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-434.947.431.
- ALPLA SWISS AG, Buhmann AG, Cornelia Flecker are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.03.2022
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Margrethen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.093.797-6
UID/VAT
CHE-434.947.431
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Logistik, Kommissionierung und Administration; Projektierung, Planung und Ausführung von Markteinführungen und -eintritten; Marketing- und Debitorenmanagement; Betrieb von Call- und Contact Centern. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder solche übernehmen sowie alles vorkehren, was ihrem Zwecke dient. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Liegenschaften und Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Parcellino Versandmanagement GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005936761, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Parcellino Versandmanagement GmbH, in St. Margrethen, CHE-434.947.431, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2022, Publ. 1005568082).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rehman, Samina, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Bregenz (AT), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Lochau (AT)].
Publication number: HR02-1005568082, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Parcellino Versandmanagement GmbH, in St. Margrethen, CHE-434.947.431, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2022, Publ. 1005427451).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
VARM AG (FL-0002.599.754-9), in Vaduz (LI), Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Ljubisavljevic, Silvana, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Wien (AT), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rehman, Samina, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Lochau (AT), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, ohne Stammanteil].
Publication number: HR01-1005427451, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Parcellino Versandmanagement GmbH, in St. Margrethen, CHE-434.947.431, Schäflistrasse 1, 9430 St. Margrethen SG, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
24.02.2022.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Logistik, Kommissionierung und Administration;
Projektierung, Planung und Ausführung von Markteinführungen und -eintritten;
Marketing- und Debitorenmanagement;
Betrieb von Call- und Contact Centern. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder solche übernehmen sowie alles vorkehren, was ihrem Zwecke dient. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Liegenschaften und Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 28.02.2022 und 01.03.2022 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
VARM AG (FL-0002.599.754-9), in Vaduz (LI), Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Rehman, Samina, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Lochau (AT), Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Ljubisavljevic, Silvana, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Wien (AT), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schnider, Kurt Pius, von Widnau, in Widnau, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.