Address
c/o Drys Fiduciaire SA
Rue Haldimand 10
1003 Lausanne
Reports for PALYANCE SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PALYANCE SA
- PALYANCE SA has its legal headquarters in Lausanne, is active and operates in the sector «Services for banks and credit institutions».
- The company was founded on 24.09.2018.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 28.02.2023.
- In the commercial register the company PALYANCE SA is registered under the UID CHE-315.609.631.
- The address is identical with 36 other active companies. These include: 110 Industries SA, ADN Job SA, AIM Academy.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.09.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.181.433-0
UID/VAT
CHE-315.609.631
Sector
Services for banks and credit institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la prestation de tous conseils et services dans le domaine des paiements (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PALYANCE SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005689510, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
PALYANCE SA, à Lausanne, CHE-315.609.631 (FOSC du 14.10.2022, p. 0/1005583868). Öz Elisa n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. Velikanova Anastassia, de et à Genève, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005583868, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
PALYANCE SA, à Lausanne, CHE-315.609.631 (FOSC du 25.09.2020, p. 0/1004986474).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue William-Haldimand 10, c/o Drys Fiduciaire SA, 1003 Lausanne.
Publication number: HR02-1004986474, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
PALYANCE SA, à Lausanne, CHE-315.609.631 (FOSC du 27.09.2018, p. 0/1004464451). Jahrmann Bernard n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouvelle administratrice avec signature individuelle:
Öz Elisa, de Montreux, à Villeneuve (VD).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.