Reports for Palry SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Palry SA
- Palry SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Crissier. Palry SA belongs to the industry «Operation of restaurants» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 05.08.1982 and has one person in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 16.03.2020.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-105.886.375.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.08.1982
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Crissier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.078.314-1
UID/VAT
CHE-105.886.375
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation de restaurants, pintes à vin, cafés, bars et hôtels.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ABC gestion S.A. | Renens (VD) | <2004 | 20.01.2010 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Palry SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004853637, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Palry SA, à Crissier, CHE-105.886.375 (FOSC du 09.01.2018, p. 0/3976529).
Nouvelle adresse:
Quartier Pré-Fontaine 58, 1023 Crissier.
Publication number: 3976529, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Palry SA, à Crissier, CHE-105.886.375 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Santin Jose Antonio n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Santin Romero Carlos, d'Espagne, à Renens (VD).
Publication number: 7145940, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Palry SA, à Crissier, CH-550-0078314-1, exploitation de restaurants, pintes à vin, cafés, bars et hôtels (FOSC du 21.01.2010, p. 21/5452986). Trueb Philippe n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Santin Jose Antonio est nommé administrateur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.