Reports for Packmat Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Packmat Holding AG
- Packmat Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Olten is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of investment companies». Packmat Holding AG is active.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 11.12.2017, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SO under the UID CHE-109.441.262.
- There are 5 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: directpack.ch SA, Packmat AG, Packmat Immobilien AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Paul Hagmann,
Peter Borner,
Chiara Alena Borner,
Laura Anna Nina Borner
newest authorized signatories
Paul Hagmann,
Peter Borner,
Chiara Alena Borner,
Laura Anna Nina Borner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.01.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Olten
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.001.926-2
UID/VAT
CHE-109.441.262
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten und Veräussern von Beteiligungen an Handels-, Dienstleistungs- und Produktionsbetrieben sowie Erbringen von Management-Dienstleistungen, insbesondere für Tochter- und Beteiligungsgesellschaften. Kann im In- und Ausland Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern, sich an anderen Unternehmen gleicher oder ähnlicher Art beteiligen, Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln oder veräussern, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und überhaupt alle Geschäfte tätigen, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft zusammenhängen oder diesen zu fördern geeignet sind.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Solidis Revisions AG | Olten | 26.06.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Solidis Treuhand AG | Olten | <2004 | 25.06.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Packmat Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3922527, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Packmat Holding AG, in Olten, CHE-109.441.262, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 20.11.2017, Publ. 3879093).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Borner, Simon Peter, von Olten, in Olten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3879093, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Packmat Holding AG, in Olten, CHE-109.441.262, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 11.04.2016, Publ. 2771023).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hagmann, Paul, von Kappel (SO), in Kappel (SO), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2771023, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Packmat Holding AG, in Olten, CHE-109.441.262, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 26.06.2015, Publ. 2232725).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Borner, Laura Anna Nina, von Olten, in Olten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Borner, Simon Peter, von Olten, in Olten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Borner, Peter, von Olten und Rickenbach (SO), in Olten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Borner, Chiara Alena, von Olten, in Olten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.