Reports for Oxana S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Oxana S.A.
- Oxana S.A. is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Avenches.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 30.08.2021.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.008.513.
- On the same address there are 11 other active companies registered. These include: Abinova Sàrl, BF Moustiquaires Sàrl, Cosmicoda Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.01.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Avenches
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.171.604-5
UID/VAT
CHE-101.008.513
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes affaires immobilières, ainsi que toutes participations financières en Suisse et à l'étranger.
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Oxana S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005280362, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Oxana S.A., à Avenches, CHE-101.008.513 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue de Lausanne 9, CP 35, 1580 Avenches. Ziegler Leo est maintenant à Baar. Marty Corinne, de Bürglen (UR), à Zufikon, est membre présidente du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 989679, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Oxana S.A., à Avenches, CH-550-0171604-5 (FOSC du 06.03.2009, p. 18/4913908).
Nouvelle adresse:
rue du Collège 10, case postale 226, 1580 Avenches.
Publication number: 4913908, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Oxana S.A., à Avenches, CH-550-0171604-5, toutes affaires immobilières (FOSC du 11.06.2002, p. 16/506268). Statuts modifiés le 20 février 2009. Selon déclaration du conseil d'administration du 20 février 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Schifferle Roger n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Le président Ziegler Leo reste seul administrateur et continue à signer individuellement. Markus Gisler n'est plus organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.