Reports for OWM AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout OWM AG
- OWM AG with its legal headquarters in Root is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with various goods». OWM AG is active.
- OWM AG was founded on 23.11.2005.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 10.09.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-112.646.379.
- 2 various trademarks or applications have been registered by the company OWM AG in the IPI.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Yves Alexander Burgener,
Domenico Conte,
Roger Buchwalder,
Nicole Schnell,
Dominik Graf
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.11.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Root
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-130.3.010.908-7
UID/VAT
CHE-112.646.379
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Übernahme von Vertretungen aller Art, vor allem auf dem Gebiet der Aufbereitung von Trink- und Badewasser und der Nutzung der Sonnenenergie; kann Liegenschaften sowie Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwerten und veräussern und überhaupt alle kaufmännischen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen, sei es auf eigene oder fremde Rechnung.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HB&P Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Basel | 29.11.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
28.09.2005 | deleted | 55801/2005 | |
OWM | 20.09.2005 | deleted | 55420/2005 |
Newest SOGC notifications: OWM AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005288646, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
OWM AG, in Root, CHE-112.646.379, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2020, Publ. 1004830460).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Conte, Domenico, von Wahlen, in Wahlen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Laufen].
Publication number: HR02-1004830460, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
OWM AG, in Root, CHE-112.646.379, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 27.02.2019, Publ. 1004575873).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weber, Armin, von Laufenburg, in Kriens, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burgener, Yves, von Saas-Fee, in Breitenbach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004575873, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
OWM AG, in Root, CHE-112.646.379, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 13.01.2016, S.0, Publ. 2593259).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gaberell, Pascal, von Murten, in Küssnacht SZ, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.