Reports for Otto Kohler AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Otto Kohler AG
- Otto Kohler AG with its legal headquarters in Liesberg Dorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Otto Kohler AG is active.
- The management of the company Otto Kohler AG consists of 6 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 07.04.1967.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 19.07.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Otto Kohler AG is registered under the UID CHE-107.212.087.
Management (6)
newest board members
Patric Daniel Kottmann,
Simon Kottmann,
Silvia Kohler,
Regula Fernandez-Kohler,
Augusto Fernandez
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.04.1967
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Liesberg
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.900.181-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.212.087
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und Verkauf sowie die Verwaltung und Vermietung von lmmobilien im ln- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, ferner Zweigniederlassungen im ln- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen und Patente, Lizenzen und Vertretungen übernehmen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Laufen | 25.06.2014 | 18.07.2023 | |
Ramseier Treuhand AG | Pratteln | <2004 | 12.01.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Kohler Otto AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Otto Kohler AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005799125, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Otto Kohler AG, in Liesberg, CHE-107.212.087, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 219 vom 12.11.2019, Publ. 1004757481).
Statutenänderung:
30.06.2023.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und Verkauf sowie die Verwaltung und Vermietung von lmmobilien im ln- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, ferner Zweigniederlassungen im ln- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen und Patente, Lizenzen und Vertretungen übernehmen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich (einschliesslich E-Mail oder anderer elektronischer Kommunikationsmittel) an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Adressen unter Vorbehalt abweichender gesetzlicher oder statutarischer Bestimmungen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 30.06.2023 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kohler-Christ, Olga, von Liesberg, in Liesberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kottmann-Kohler, Luzia, von Liesberg, in Laufen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
BDO AG (CHE-320.101.456), in Laufen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kottmann, Patric, von Aesch (LU), in Hölstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kottmann, Simon, von Aesch (LU), in Laufen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004757481, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Otto Kohler AG, in Liesberg, CHE-107.212.087, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 25.06.2014, S.0, Publ. 1573733).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kohler, Silvia, von Liesberg, in Brislach, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Kohler-Christ, Olga, von Liesberg, in Liesberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1573733, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Otto Kohler AG, in Liesberg, CHE-107.212.087, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 13.01.2014, Publ. 1281259).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kohler, Daniel, von Liesberg, in Liesberg, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Fernandez, Augusto, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Liesberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
BDO AG (CHE-320.101.456), in Laufen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.