Reports for ORL on move AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ORL on move AG
- ORL on move AG is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Dürnten.
- The company was founded on 06.03.2012.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 31.05.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- ORL on move AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-301.342.924.
- On the same address as ORL on move AG there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: AT Alpha Technology AG, ATN - Akademie für angewandte Tierpsychologie und Tierverhaltenstraining AG, LANDI Bachtel, Genossenschaft.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.03.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dürnten
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.037.636-3
UID/VAT
CHE-301.342.924
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Zurverfügungstellung von Infrastruktur für Behandlungen im Bereich konservative und operative ORL, Hals- und Gesichtschirurgie. Die Gesellschaft kann Handel betreiben mit der Infrastruktur und damit zusammenhängenden Objekten und Gegenständen für Behandlungen im Bereich konservative und operative ORL, Hals- und Gesichtschirurgie. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TBO Revisions AG | Zürich | 09.03.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ORL on move AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006044612, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ORL on move AG, in Dürnten, CHE-301.342.924, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2022, Publ. 1005519325).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Badertscher, Dr. Beat, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wichser, Dr. Elena Paola, von Glarus Süd, in Maur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Maranta, Dr. Christian Arturo, von Poschiavo, in Egg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hirt, Pascal Alex, von Feuerthalen, in Schaffhausen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005519325, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ORL on move AG, in Dürnten, CHE-301.342.924, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 181 vom 19.09.2019, Publ. 1004719285).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Diener-Lüthi, Barbara, von Bubikon, in Maur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004719285, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ORL on move AG, in Dürnten, CHE-301.342.924, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 15.03.2012, S.0, Publ. 6595276).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Maranta, Dr. Christian Arturo, von Poschiavo, in Egg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Küsnacht (ZH)];
Wichser, Dr. Elena Paola, von Glarus Süd, in Maur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zumikon].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.