Reports for Orat GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Orat GmbH
- Orat GmbH has its legal headquarters in Würenlingen, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 02.02.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register AG under the UID CHE-103.432.081.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.01.1996
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Würenlingen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.017.166-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.432.081
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erstellen von typisierten Häusern, Kauf und Verkauf von Baumaterialien und -teilen, Marketing sowie alle Tätigkeiten im Zusammenhang mit Architekturleistungen; die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Lizenzen und Vertretungen übernehmen sowie im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Tarohaus GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Orat GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005951446, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Orat GmbH, in Würenlingen, CHE-103.432.081, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 16.12.2022, Publ. 1005630810).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
taro architekten würenlingen ag (CHE-110.152.008), in Würenlingen, Gesellschafterin, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 10'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Christen, Marcel Alois, von Oberdorf (NW), in Mettauertal, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, ohne Stammanteil];
Christen, Hans Ulrich, von Oberdorf (NW), in Zeihen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005630810, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Orat GmbH, in Würenlingen, CHE-103.432.081, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 21.01.2021, Publ. 1005079796).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
taro architekten Peter & Fabrice Müller GmbH (CHE-376.963.346), Gesellschafterin, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Müller, Fabrice Linus Alfred, von Wohlen (AG), in Wohlen (AG), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
taro architekten würenlingen ag (CHE-110.152.008), in Würenlingen, Gesellschafterin, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00];
Christen, Marcel Alois, von Oberdorf (NW), in Mettauertal, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005079796, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Orat GmbH, in Würenlingen, CHE-103.432.081, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 19.02.2009, S.3, Publ. 4889064).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Peter, von Wohlen AG, in Wohlen AG, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
taro architekten Peter & Fabrice Müller GmbH (CHE-376.963.346) [ CH-400.4.447.205-0], Gesellschafterin, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Christen, Marcel Alois, von Oberdorf (NW), in Mettauertal, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Christen, Marcel, ];
Müller, Fabrice Linus Alfred, von Wohlen (AG), in Wohlen (AG), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.