Branches (1)
Reports for Omya AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Omya AG
- Omya AG with its legal headquarters in Oftringen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Business management and administration». Omya AG is active.
- The management has 11 active persons registered.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 26.04.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-105.816.446.
- The IPI database currently contains 38 trademarks or applications for the company Omya AG.
- Next to the company Omya AG there are 12 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Forsag AG, Mozaiq Switzerland AG, Omya (Schweiz) AG.
Management (11)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Pascal Olivier Haller,
Iwona Stasiewicz,
Andreas Lüthi,
Michael Both,
Markus Held
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.12.1903
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oftringen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.917.212-8
UID/VAT
CHE-105.816.446
CHE-116.326.548 VAT
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb und Verwaltung von Beteiligungen in jeder Form an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland, sowie sonstige Anlage von Kapitalien und Koordinierungs- und Ueberwachungstätigkeiten im Rahmen der Omya Gruppe.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Zürich | 03.07.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 07.06.2013 | 02.07.2023 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 | 06.06.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Omya LTD
- Omya SA
- Plüss-Staufer AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Omya Optical | 12.02.2019 | active | 78428/2018 |
Omya Agrocarb | 05.04.2018 | active | 71076/2018 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Omya AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006019168, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya AG, in Oftringen, CHE-105.816.446, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 09.04.2024, Publ. 1006004527).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eblé, Jean-Loup, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aesch (BL), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Haller, Pascal, von Reinach (AG), in Rothrist, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Suchet, Cédric , französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Pratteln, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Hagenthal-le-Bas (FR)].
Publication number: HR02-1006004527, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya AG, in Oftringen, CHE-105.816.446, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 02.08.2023, Publ. 1005808530).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kaspar, Marco, von Oberkulm, in Sursee, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stasiewicz, Iwona, polnische Staatsangehörige, in Rothrist, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005808530, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya AG, in Oftringen, CHE-105.816.446, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 03.07.2023, Publ. 1005784843).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Both, Michael, von Burgdorf, in Oetwil an der Limmat, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eblé, Jean-Loup, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aesch (BL), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lüthi, Andreas, von Rüderswil, in Oensingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.