Reports for OLWO STALDEN AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout OLWO STALDEN AG
- OLWO STALDEN AG from Konolfingen operates in the sector «Production and processing of wooden goods» and is active.
- The management of the company OLWO STALDEN AG, which was founded on the 13.01.1964, consists of 5 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 19.02.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-105.978.468.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Mirco Häfliger,
Heinz Lädrach,
Ulrich Lädrach,
Thomas Lädrach,
Markus Lädrach
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.01.1964
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Konolfingen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.008.567-8
UID/VAT
CHE-105.978.468
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Holzverarbeitung und den Handel mit Holz. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen im In- und Ausland erwerben, errichten oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Patente, Lizenzen und Vertretungen im In- und Ausland erwerben, verwalten und übertragen, Grundstücke und Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Bern | 19.02.2024 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Unico Treuhand AG | Burgdorf | 24.05.2017 | 18.02.2024 | |
Kenora AG | Kirchberg (BE) | 09.03.2010 | 23.05.2017 | |
H. U. Gerber Treuhand AG | Mühleberg | <2004 | 08.03.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hobelwerk Stalden AG
- Kistenfabrik Stalden AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: OLWO STALDEN AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005964276, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
OLWO STALDEN AG, in Konolfingen, CHE-105.978.468, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 05.11.2020, Publ. 1005015544).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Unico Treuhand AG (CHE-106.486.498), in Burgdorf, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-430.259.378), in Bern, Revisionsstelle;
Häfliger, Mirco, von Menznau, in Grünenmatt (Lützelflüh), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Oberburg].
Publication number: HR02-1005015544, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
OLWO STALDEN AG, in Konolfingen, CHE-105.978.468, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 27.12.2018, Publ. 1004530587).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Germann, Christian, von Adelboden, in Oey (Diemtigen), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lädrach, Ulrich, von Konolfingen, in Boll (Vechigen), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lädrach, Markus, von Konolfingen, in Worb, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004530587, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hobelwerk Stalden AG, in Konolfingen, CHE-105.978.468, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 24.05.2017, Publ. 3540977).
Statutenänderung:
13.12.2018.
Firma neu:
OLWO STALDEN AG.
Domizil neu:
Thunstrasse 55, 3510 Konolfingen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.