Reports for Olus AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Olus AG
- Olus AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Sins. Olus AG belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 27.06.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register AG under the UID CHE-113.065.340.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Keller Früchte + Gemüse AG, TastyWaste GmbH.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Lukas Josef Hossli,
Marco Krähenbühl,
Beat Keller,
Sabrina Keller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.08.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sins
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-140.3.002.871-0
UID/VAT
CHE-113.065.340
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Finanzierung, Verwalten und Veräusserung von Immobilien; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaft errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rebex AG | Dietikon | 30.03.2017 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
allRe Revision AG in Liquidation | Dübendorf | 12.06.2013 | 29.03.2017 | |
COBALU GmbH in Liquidation | Luzern | 06.01.2009 | 11.06.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Rammelmeyer AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Olus AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006069104, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Olus AG, in Sins, CHE-113.065.340, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 25.04.2023, Publ. 1005731735).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Beat, von Oberthal, in Küssnacht (SZ), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Sins];
Keller, Sabrina, von Sennwald, in Küssnacht (SZ), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Sins].
Publication number: HR02-1005731735, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Olus AG, in Sins, CHE-113.065.340, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 12.04.2019, Publ. 1004609816).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hossli, Lukas Josef, von Zeihen, in Windisch, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Krähenbühl, Marco, von Trub, in Oberägeri, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004609816, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Olus AG, in Sins, CHE-113.065.340, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2019, Publ. 1004555584).
Statutenänderung:
01.04.2019.
Zweck neu:
Erwerb, Finanzierung, Verwalten und Veräusserung von Immobilien;
kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaft errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.