Reports for Olmecs AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Olmecs AG
- Olmecs AG with its legal headquarters in Urdorf is active. Olmecs AG operates in the sector «Trading in IT and communications products».
- The management of the company Olmecs AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 29.11.2010.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 19.05.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Olmecs AG is the following: CHE-116.264.657.
- The address is identical with 11 other active companies. These include: Contena-Ochsner AG, Diamantbohr AG, Herzog Dichtungen AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.11.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Urdorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.035.876-4
UID/VAT
CHE-116.264.657
Sector
Trading in IT and communications products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung, Produktion und den Handel im Bereich der Elektronik. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ENGEL COPERA AG | Köniz | 19.05.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ENGEL COPERA AG | Interlaken | 20.04.2022 | 18.05.2023 | |
WPnet Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Köniz | 03.12.2010 | 19.04.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Olmecs AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005749205, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Olmecs AG, in Urdorf, CHE-116.264.657, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2022, Publ. 1005453799).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
WPnet Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-308.019.513), in Interlaken, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ENGEL COPERA AG (CHE-103.132.443), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005453799, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Olmecs AG, in Urdorf, CHE-116.264.657, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2017, S.0, Publ. 3661051).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunner, Silvia, von Wald (ZH), in Wettswil am Albis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
WPnet Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-308.019.513), in Interlaken, Revisionsstelle [bisher: WPnet Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CH-170.3.021.087-5), in Muri bei Bern].
Publication number: 3661051, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Olmecs AG, in Urdorf, CHE-116.264.657, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 14.05.2014, Publ. 1500929).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zuber, Christoph, von Urdorf und Günsberg, in Urdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.