Reports for Oil-Dri SARL
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Oil-Dri SARL
- Oil-Dri SARL is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Coppet. Oil-Dri SARL belongs to the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 19.10.1972.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 29.01.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- Oil-Dri SARL is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-106.976.029.
Management (5)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Susan Kreh,
Dan Jaffee,
Oil-Dri Corporation of America,
Dora Maag,
Bruce Patsey
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.10.1972
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Coppet
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.001.654-8
UID/VAT
CHE-106.976.029
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vente de produits minéraux ou chimiques; toute opération de transformation ou de fabrication se rapportant à ces produits.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Grant Thornton AG | Zürich | 10.07.2014 | 26.06.2019 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Genève | 31.08.2004 | 09.07.2014 | |
Daniel Wagneur FCCA | Genève | <2004 | 30.08.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Oil-Dri GmbH
- Oil-Dri LLC
- Oil-Dri SA
- Oil-Dri S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Oil-Dri SARL
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005946794, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Oil-Dri SARL, à Coppet, CHE-106.976.029 (FOSC du 24.01.2022, p. 0/1005388260). Fernández Méndez Sergio n'est plus gérant;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouvelle gérante:
Maag Dora, de Oberglatt, à Arzier-Le Muids, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005388260, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Oil-Dri SARL, à Coppet, CHE-106.976.029 (FOSC du 13.01.2020, p. 0/1004803111). Maag Dora n'est plus gérante, sa signature est radiée. Fernández Méndez Sergio, qui est désormais à Lausanne, est nommé gérant et signe désormais individuellement.
Publication number: HR02-1004803111, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Oil-Dri SARL, à Coppet, CHE-106.976.029 (FOSC du 25.03.2019, p. 0/1004595240). Libert Jeffrey M. n'est plus gérant;
sa signature est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.