Reports for Ofac société coopérative
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ofac société coopérative
- Ofac société coopérative is a Cooperative with its legal headquarters in Genève. Ofac société coopérative belongs to the industry «Fiduciary services» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 20 persons. The organization was founded on 29.04.1963.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 23.08.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Ofac société coopérative is registered in the Canton of GE under the UID CHE-107.755.086.
- 9 trademarks or applications for trademarks of the organization Ofac société coopérative are registered at the IPI.
- Companies with the same address as Ofac société coopérative: APOFIN SA, ARCHI-DT SA, succursale de Genève, Astral SA.
Management (20)
newest members of the administration
Paul Salmi,
Christian Neukomm,
Alexandra Endrass-Korach,
Federico Marcel Antoine Tamò,
Jean-Noël Eric Jaton
newest authorized signatories
Samuel Dalcher,
Madiha Favre Lalla,
Paul Salmi,
Christian Neukomm,
Alexandra Endrass-Korach
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.04.1963
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.060.963-9
UID/VAT
CHE-107.755.086
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fournir à ses membres les moyens d'alléger leurs tâches administratives et comptables; favoriser et harmoniser les relations de ses membres, soit entre eux, soit avec des tiers, notamment avec les pouvoirs publics, les institutions d'assurances et des associations professionnelles.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidinter SA | Lausanne | 20.09.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Lambelet Société Anonyme Fidal | Lausanne | 02.08.2010 | 24.10.2022 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
ABILIS | 26.03.2020 | active | 09769/2019 |
18.03.2020 | active | 09770/2019 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Ofac société coopérative
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006113461, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Ofac société coopérative, à Genève, CHE-107.755.086 (FOSC du 25.04.2024, p. 0/1006018315). Signature collective à deux a été conférée à Dalcher Samuel, de La Chaux-de-Fonds, à Vionnaz.
Publication number: HR02-1006018315, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Ofac société coopérative, à Genève, CHE-107.755.086 (FOSC du 01.03.2024, p. 0/1005975657). La procuration de Marmy Serge est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005975657, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Ofac société coopérative, à Genève, CHE-107.755.086 (FOSC du 29.01.2024, p. 0/1005946952). Les pouvoirs de Heinzer Thibault sont radiés.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.