Address
Impasse de la Fin Derrey 2
1752 Villars-sur-Glâne
Reports for of architectures sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout of architectures sàrl
- of architectures sàrl with its legal headquarters in Villars-sur-Glâne is a Limited liability company from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». of architectures sàrl is active.
- The company was founded on 07.12.2007 and has one person in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 11.09.2017.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-113.971.770.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.12.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Villars-sur-Glâne
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.539.122-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.971.770
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gestion et exploitation d'un bureau d'architecture et d'urbanisme comprenant toutes activités techniques, créatrices et économiques propres à son exploitation ainsi que tous investissements et ou participations pouvant en découler en Suisse et à l'étranger.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: of architectures sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3744323, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
of architectures sàrl, à Villars-sur-Glâne, CHE-113.971.770 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826).
Nouvelle adresse:
Impasse de la Fin Derrey 2, 1752 Villars-sur-Glâne.
Publication number: 6999490, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
of architectures sàrl, à Fribourg, CH-217-3539122-2, gestion et exploitation d'un bureau d'architecture et d'urbanisme, etc. (FOSC du 12.05.2011, p. 0/6159522). Siège transféré à Villars-sur-Glâne, Chemin des Eaux-Vives 16, 1752 Villars-sur-Glâne. Statuts modifiés le 19.12.2012. Eugster François, associé gérant, se nomme précisément Eugster François Noël. L'inscription du 09.05.2011 (FOSC du 12.05.2011, Id 6159522) est complétée en ce sens que référence est faite au but complet selon les statuts.
Publication number: 6159522, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
of architectures sàrl, à Fribourg, CH-217-3539122-2, gestion et exploitation d'un bureau d'architecture et d'urbanisme comprenant toutes activités techniques, etc. (FOSC du 12.01.2011, p. 8). Statuts modifiés le 05.05.2011.
Prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
selon statuts.
Communication aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Chenevart Olivier n'est plus associé par suite de cession de sa part de CHF 10'000.-- à l'associé inscrit Eugster François, dont la part de CHF 10'000.-- passe à CHF 20'000.--. Division de la part de CHF 20'000.-- de l'associé Eugster François en 200 parts de CHF 100.--. Chenevart Olivier n'est plus gérant, sa signature est radiée. L'associé Eugster François devient gérant unique avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.