Address
c/o Zurbriggen Treuhand AG
Märtmattenstrasse 3
3930 Visp
Reports for OES Optical Engineering Services Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout OES Optical Engineering Services Sàrl
- OES Optical Engineering Services Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Visp and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company OES Optical Engineering Services Sàrl consists of 2 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 10.03.2015. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-100.947.897.
- Companies with the same address as OES Optical Engineering Services Sàrl: AZed Asset AG, B & F Barriers & Fences AG, B&F Baumaschinen & Factoring AG.
Management (2)
Executive board
Prof. Dr. Wermer Hartmut Ludwig Schmidt,
Stephan Andenmatten
newest authorized signatories
Prof. Dr. Wermer Hartmut Ludwig Schmidt,
Stephan Andenmatten
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.08.1998
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Visp
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.4.004.407-7
UID/VAT
CHE-100.947.897
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Recherche, développement, conseil et transfert de technologie dans le domaine de l'optique et du traitement d'image, ainsi que production, négociation et commerce de produits correspondants et mise à disposition de personnel scientifique.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- OES Optical Engineering Services GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: OES Optical Engineering Services Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2033455, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
OES Optical Engineering Services Sàrl, in Visp, CHE-100.947.897, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 18.11.2011, Publ. 6422598).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Geiser, Martial Prof., von Langenthal, in Sion, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidt, Wermer Hartmut Ludwig Prof. Dr., genannt Hartmut, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wiesbaden (DE), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Schmidt, Hartmut Prof. Dr. und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00];
Andenmatten, Stephan, von Saas Almagell, in Visp, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Andenmatten, Stefan].
Publication number: 6422656, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
OES Optical Engineering Services Sàrl, à Sion, CH-626.4.004.407-7, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 45 du 06.03.2001, p. 1675). Par suite de transfert du siège à Visp, la société a été inscrite au registre du commerce du Haut-Valais. En conséquence, elle est radiée d'office du registre du commerce du Valais Central.
Publication number: 6422598, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
OES Optical Engineering Services Sàrl, bisher in Sion, CH-626.4.004.407-7, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 06.03.2001, S. 1675).
Gründungsstatuten:
26.06.1998.
Statutenänderung:
31.10.2011.
Sitz neu:
Visp.
Domizil neu:
c/o Zurbriggen Treuhand AG, Märtmattenstrasse 3, 3930 Visp. Gemäss Erklärung vom 31.10.2011 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision. [Die übrigen Änderungen betreffen die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen nicht.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidt, Hartmut Prof. Dr., deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wiesbaden (DE), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.