Reports for Ochsentorkel Weinbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ochsentorkel Weinbau AG
- Ochsentorkel Weinbau AG from Thal operates in the sector «Beverage production (with alcohol)» and is active.
- Ochsentorkel Weinbau AG was founded on 01.01.1916.
- The last commercial register change was made on 04.01.2022. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the company Ochsentorkel Weinbau AG is registered under the UID CHE-108.732.432.
Management (4)
newest board members
Tom Kobel,
Beat Bosshart,
Harald Dornbierer,
Johannes Reimann
newest authorized signatories
Tom Kobel,
Beat Bosshart,
Harald Dornbierer,
Johannes Reimann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1916
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thal
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.5.004.761-5
UID/VAT
CHE-108.732.432
Sector
Beverage production (with alcohol)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Weinkellerei sowie An- und Verkauf von Wein. Die Gesellschaft kann selbst auf eigenem oder gepachteten Rebland Weinbau betreiben, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, solche finanzieren sowie Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten sowie Grundstücke erwerben, belasten, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RMI Treuhandexperten AG | Goldach | 03.04.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ochsentorkel Weinbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005372941, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Ochsentorkel Weinbau AG, in Thal, CHE-108.732.432, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 10.09.2018, S.0, Publ. 1004452401).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
RMI Treuhandexperten AG (CHE-109.362.786), in Goldach, Revisionsstelle [bisher: in Staad SG (Thal)].
Publication number: HR02-1004452401, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Ochsentorkel Weinbau AG, in Thal, CHE-108.732.432, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 256 vom 31.12.2010, S. 9, Publ. 5968880).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reimann, Salome, von Basel, in Altenrhein (Thal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
RMI Treuhandexperten AG (CHE-109.362.786), in Staad SG (Thal), Revisionsstelle [bisher: RMI Treuhandexperten AG (CH-320.3.050.678-4)].
Publication number: 5968880, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Ochsentorkel Weinbau AG, in Thal, CH-320.5.004.761-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 21.01.2008, S. 11, Publ. 4298274).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
RMI Treuhandexperten AG (CH-320.3.050.678-4), in Staad SG (Thal), Revisionsstelle [bisher: Ruggli & Michel Treuhand AG, in Staad SG (Thal)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.