Reports for Nukleartechnikerschule
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Nukleartechnikerschule
- Nukleartechnikerschule is active in the industry «Other services in education» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Baden.
- The management of the organization Nukleartechnikerschule consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 10.12.2020.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 26.10.2023.
- In the commercial register the organization Nukleartechnikerschule is registered under the UID CHE-279.194.520.
Management (5)
newest members of the committee
newest authorized signatories
Markus Rüegger,
Bernd Mücke,
Andreas Peter Frei,
Hansjörg Künzli,
Monika Maria Fuchs
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.12.2020
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Baden
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.6.448.413-0
UID/VAT
CHE-279.194.520
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein bezweckt die Aus- und Weiterbildung im Bereich Nukleartechnologie und Grossanlagenbetrieb. Der Verein kann Kurse und Lehrgänge auf dem Niveau einer höheren Fachschule gemäss den Bundesgesetz über die Berufsbildung und den einschlägigen Verordnungen führen. Der Verein kann zudem alle Aktivitäten ausüben, die zum Führen von Aus- und Weiterbildungen der Nukleartechnikerschule erforderlich sind. Der Verein ist konfessionell und politisch neutral. Er ist nicht gewinnorientiert. Er kann zur Förderung des Zweckes die Mitgliedschaften bei anderen Organisationen, Einrichtungen und Verbänden im In- und Ausland erwerben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Olten | 15.12.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Nukleartechnikerschule
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005869836, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Nukleartechnikerschule, in Baden, CHE-279.194.520, Verein (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2023, Publ. 1005812165).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schnetgöke-Pfeiffer, Uwe Gregor, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Reinach (BL), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005812165, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Nukleartechnikerschule, in Baden, CHE-279.194.520, Verein (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 11.02.2022, Publ. 1005403774).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Franke, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Laufenburg, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rüegger, Markus, von Rothrist, in Brittnau, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Mücke, Bernd, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Dogern (DE), Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005403774, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Nukleartechnikerschule, in Baden, CHE-279.194.520, Verein (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2020, Publ. 1005048033). [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2022].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frei, Andreas Peter, von Zurzach, in Klingnau, Vizepräsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Rietheim].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.