Reports for nugolo AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout nugolo AG
- nugolo AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Baar. nugolo AG belongs to the industry «IT services» and is currently active.
- nugolo AG has 2 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 13.09.2022.
- The company's UID is CHE-283.909.788.
- There are 50 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Aktiengesellschaft für Projektentwicklung, Bau + Immo Pro AG, bau4you ag.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.07.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Baar
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.037.028-0
UID/VAT
CHE-283.909.788
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung, Herstellung, Vermarktung und Schulung von Cloud Computing Lösungen sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen und Entwicklung, speziell auf den Gebieten der Informatik, Telekommunikation, IT und Software-/ Applikationsentwicklung und Handel mit und Vermittlung von Waren aller Art, insbesondere von technischen Produkten; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- nugolo SA
- nugolo Ltd.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: nugolo AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005560454, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
nugolo AG, in Cham, CHE-283.909.788, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 171 vom 05.09.2014, S.0, Publ. 1700737).
Statutenänderung:
02.09.2022.
Sitz neu:
Baar.
Domizil neu:
Schochenmühlestrasse 2, 6340 Baar.
Publication number: 1700737, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
nugolo AG, in Cham, CHE-283.909.788, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 24.07.2012, Publ. 6783322).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Staub, Heiner, von Dorf und Ochlenberg, in Küssnacht SZ, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6783322, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
nugolo AG (nugolo SA) (nugolo Ltd.), in Cham, CH-170.3.037.028-0, Alte Steinhauserstrasse 1, 6330 Cham, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
04.07.2012.
Zweck:
Entwicklung, Herstellung, Vermarktung und Schulung von Cloud Computing Lösungen sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen und Entwicklung, speziell auf den Gebieten der Informatik, Telekommunikation, IT und Software-/ Applikationsentwicklung und Handel mit und Vermittlung von Waren aller Art, insbesondere von technischen Produkten;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, Telefax oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Mit Erklärung vom 04.07.2012 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Eisenmann, Sinisa, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zug, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift und Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Allers, Dirk, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Cappel (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Staub, Heiner, von Dorf und Ochlenberg, in Küssnacht SZ, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.