Address
c/o St. Gallischer Bauernverband
Magdenauerstrasse 2
9230 Flawil
Reports for NSG Nutz- und Schlachtviehgenossenschaft
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NSG Nutz- und Schlachtviehgenossenschaft
- NSG Nutz- und Schlachtviehgenossenschaft is currently active and the industry «Associations and federations». The legal headquarters are in Flawil.
- The management has 9 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 09.02.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.133.772.
- The address is identical with 5 other active companies. These include: falun GmbH, Kontrolldienst KUT AG, Paul und Hulda Gantenbein Stiftung.
Management (9)
newest members of the administration
Ruedi Thomann,
Alfred Preisig,
Peter Sprecher,
Pius Riget,
Anton Huber
newest authorized signatories
Ruedi Thomann,
Patrick Altherr,
Alexandra Köfer,
Eugen Schläpfer
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.10.1946
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Flawil
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.5.000.954-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.133.772
Sector
Associations and federations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung des Schlacht- und Nutzviehabsatzes; Organisation und Durchführung von Viehannahmen und Viehmärkten; Beratung und Orientierung der Mitglieder über Marktlage und Preisgestaltung; sie kann sich an anderen Organisationen und Unternehmen beteiligen sowie eine Schlachtviehversicherung betreiben und zu diesem Zweck einene Schlachtviehversicherungsfonds einrichten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schlachtviehverwertungs-Genossenschaft St. Gallen-Appenzell SGA
- Schlachtviehverwertungsgenossenschaft St. Gallen-Appenzell SGA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: NSG Nutz- und Schlachtviehgenossenschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005957512, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2024 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 560 vom 16.01.2024 NSG Nutz- und Schlachtviehgenossenschaft, in Flawil, CHE-107.133.772, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2024, Publ. 1005939051).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dörig, Markus, von Appenzell, in Haslen AI (Schlatt-Haslen), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [nicht: in Haslen GL (Glarus Süd)].
Publication number: HR02-1005939051, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
NSG Nutz- und Schlachtviehgenossenschaft, in Flawil, CHE-107.133.772, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 06.04.2023, Publ. 1005719278).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Dr. Karl, von Istighofen und Schönholzerswilen, in St. Gallen, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bleiker, Walter, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Wattwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Müller, Hans, von Fischingen, in Oberuzwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Scherrer, Gerald, von Gams, in Gams, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Ritter, Andreas, von Hasle bei Burgdorf, in Engelburg (Gaiserwald), Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Koller, Franz, von Appenzell, in Gommiswald, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Rutz, Ernst, von Neckertal, in Bächli (Hemberg) (Neckertal), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Thomann, Ruedi, von Pfäfers, in Valens (Pfäfers), Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Preisig, Alfred, von Schwellbrunn, in Frümsen (Sennwald), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Riget, Pius, von Schänis, in Schänis, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Sprecher, Peter, von Grabs, in Grabserberg (Grabs), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Köfer, Alexandra, von Lengnau (AG), in Appenzell Meistersrüte (Appenzell), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Altherr, Patrick, von Speicher, in Herisau, stellvertretender Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005719278, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
NSG Nutz- und Schlachtviehgenossenschaft, in Flawil, CHE-107.133.772, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 49 vom 11.03.2010, S.15, Publ. 5535694).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huber, Toni, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Oberhelfenschwil (Neckertal), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Oberhelfenschwil];
Rutz, Ernst, von Neckertal, in Bächli (Hemberg) (Neckertal), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Hemberg, in Bächli (Hemberg)]. [behördliche Änderung infolge Gemeindefusion].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.