Reports for Ninger AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ninger AG
- Ninger AG is active in the industry «Other construction» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Rikon im Tösstal.
- Ninger AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 03.02.2016. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Ninger AG is the following: CHE-108.378.224.
- Astra Sanitär-Solar AG, Ninger Immobilien AG have the same address as Ninger AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.10.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zell (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.006.562-9
UID/VAT
CHE-108.378.224
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Arbeiten im Bereich Bauspenglerei, Blitzschutzanlagen und Flachbedachungen; kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern sowie sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lüthi Treuhand | Illnau-Effretikon | <2004 | 16.06.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ninger AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2636321, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ninger AG, in Winterthur, CHE-108.378.224, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 17.06.2009, S. 25, Publ. 5072876).
Statutenänderung:
20.01.2016.
Sitz neu:
Zell ZH.
Domizil neu:
Rankstrasse 4, 8486 Rikon im Tösstal.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Truninger, Marcel, von Altikon, in Buch am Irchel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Wila];
Bänninger, Thomas, von Oberembrach, in Dägerlen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Seuzach];
Bänninger, Marco, von Turbenthal, in Winterthur, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5072876, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ninger AG, in Winterthur, CH-020.3.006.562-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 07.09.2004, S. 21, Publ. 2437150).
Statutenänderung:
10.06.2009.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 10.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lüthi Treuhand, in Illnau-Effretikon, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Truninger, Marcel, von Altikon, in Wila, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher:in Turbenthal];
Bänninger, Thomas, von Oberembrach, in Seuzach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher:in Turbenthal].
Publication number: 2437150, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ninger AG, in Winterthur, CH-020.3.006.562-9, Bauspenglerei, Blitzschutzanlagen und Flachbedachungen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 17.12.2003, S. 23, Publ. 2032376).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Truninger-Fahrer, Susanne, von Altikon und Schnottwil, in Turbenthal, Mitglied, mit Einzelprokura.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.