AddressRue de la Manufacture 41967 Bramois |
Unlock additional contact details such as phone, website or email address |
About
Niklaus Wittwer SA
- Niklaus Wittwer SA is active in the industry «Viticulture» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Bramois.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 01.12.1993.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 18.04.2024.
- Niklaus Wittwer SA is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-102.177.880.
- Next to the company Niklaus Wittwer SA there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Chai du Baron SA, RDDLB SA.
ManagementSource: SOGC |
newest board membersDavid Ernst Hauenstein, |
newest authorized signatoriesDavid Ernst Hauenstein, |
Network
View network in detail
Informationen aus dem HandelsregisterSource: SOGC |
|
Entry in the commercial register01.12.1993 |
|
Legal formCompany limited by shares (AG) |
|
Legal headquarters of the companySion |
Commercial Registry OfficeVS |
Commercial register numberCH-626.3.003.896-8 |
|
UID/VATCHE-102.177.880 |
|
SectorViticulture |
|
Purpose (Original language)Vente de vins et toutes autres activités s'y rapportant |
AuditorSource: SOGC |
|
Current auditor (1) |
|
Former auditor (1) |
Other company namesSource: SOGC |
|
Past and translated company names
|
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Niklaus Wittwer SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006012633, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Niklaus Wittwer SA, à Sion, CHE-102.177.880, société anonyme (No. FOSC 173 du 07.09.2020, Publ. 1004973510).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Wittwer, Christine, ressortissante autrichienne, à Hilterfingen, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Hauenstein, David, de Steffisburg, à Hilterfingen, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Hauenstein, Urs, de Ringgenberg (BE) et Steffisburg, à Steffisburg, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Wittwer, Niklaus, de Linden, à Hilterfingen, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: HR02-1004973510, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Niklaus Wittwer SA, à Sion, CHE-102.177.880, société anonyme (No. FOSC 96 du 19.05.2020, Publ. 1004893130).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Wittwer, Niklaus, de Linden, à Hilterfingen, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Grosshöchstetten];
Wittwer, Christine, ressortissante autrichienne, à Hilterfingen, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004893130, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Niklaus Wittwer SA, à Sion, CHE-102.177.880, société anonyme (No. FOSC 79 du 27.04.2015, p.0, Publ. 2120473).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue de la Manufacture 4, 1967 Bramois.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.