Reports for Niederer Services AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Niederer Services AG
- Niederer Services AG in Ostermundigen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Fiduciary services». Niederer Services AG is active.
- The company was founded on 11.05.2009 and has 5 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 23.02.2021.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Niederer Services AG is the following: CHE-114.862.304.
- Companies with the same address as Niederer Services AG: Bärner Zytfabrik GmbH, Bernische Lehrerversicherungskasse, Edorex AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Milos Milivojevic,
Corinne Wüthrich,
Kathrin Zehnder,
Angelika Niederer Morgenthaler,
Roger Louis Niederer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.05.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ostermundigen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.044.695-6
UID/VAT
CHE-114.862.304
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Treuhandfunktionen aller Art, insbesondere Buchführungsarbeiten bei Immobilien und Immobilienverwaltungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ENGEL COPERA AG | Köniz | 15.05.2012 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Siegenthaler Revision AG | Ittigen | 15.05.2009 | 14.05.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ECM Immofin AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Niederer Services AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005107565, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Niederer Services AG, in Ostermundigen, CHE-114.862.304, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 13.02.2019, Publ. 1004565230).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kummer, Barbara, von Oberburg, in Niederönz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Milivojevic, Milos, von Sumiswald, in Burgdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004565230, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Niederer Services AG, in Ostermundigen, CHE-114.862.304, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 204 vom 20.10.2017, Publ. 3822073).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gertsch, Reto, von Lauterbrunnen, in Münsingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Beer, Corinne, von Trub, in Langnau im Emmental, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kummer, Barbara, von Oberburg, in Niederönz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zehnder, Kathrin, von Köniz, in Faoug, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3822073, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Niederer Services AG, in Ostermundigen, CHE-114.862.304, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 23 vom 03.02.2016, Publ. 2636733).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Morgenthaler, Peter, von Staffelbach, in Hinterkappelen (Wohlen bei Bern), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederer Morgenthaler, Angelika, von Staffelbach, in Wohlen b. Bern (Wohlen bei Bern), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gertsch, Reto, von Lauterbrunnen, in Münsingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Niederer, Roger Louis, von Heiden, in Kirchberg BE (Ersigen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.