Reports for NIBRU Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NIBRU Immobilien AG
- NIBRU Immobilien AG with its legal headquarters in Kriens is active. NIBRU Immobilien AG operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- NIBRU Immobilien AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 15.12.2015, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company NIBRU Immobilien AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.212.354.
- CSD Ingenieure AG, DLK Immo & Treuhand AG, Elio Armierungen GmbH have the same address as NIBRU Immobilien AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Marina Niederberger Aguilar Guzman,
Nicole Niederberger,
Ernst Niederberger
newest authorized signatories
Marina Niederberger Aguilar Guzman,
Nicole Niederberger,
Ernst Niederberger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.01.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.784.830-9
UID/VAT
CHE-112.212.354
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten und Verkauf von Geschäftsliegenschaften, Wohnliegenschaften und Grundstücken sowie von Beteiligungen an Gesellschaften, die im Immobilienbereich tätig sind; Erbringung von Beratungsdienstleistungen aller Art.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lufida Revisions AG | Luzern | 10.07.2008 | 06.06.2010 | |
Gewerbe-Treuhand AG | Luzern | 04.01.2007 | 09.07.2008 | |
BDO AG | Luzern | 04.02.2005 | 03.01.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: NIBRU Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2540295, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
NIBRU Immobilien AG, in Kriens, CHE-112.212.354, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 19.11.2013, Publ. 1187545).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Niederberger, Andreas, von Dallenwil, in Stansstad, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit Werner Niederberger;
Niederberger, Werner, von Dallenwil, in Stansstad, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit Andreas Niederberger.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederberger, Ernst, von Dallenwil, in Oberdorf NW, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit Nicole Niederberger];
Niederberger, Nicole, von Dallenwil, in Kriens, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit Ernst Niederberger];
Niederberger Aguilar Guzman, Marina, von Dallenwil, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1187545, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
NIBRU Immobilien AG, in Kriens, CHE-112.212.354, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 107 vom 07.06.2010, S. 14, Publ. 5662610).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Niederberger, Roman, von Dallenwil, in Buochs, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit Ernst Niederberger.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederberger, Ernst, von Dallenwil, in Oberdorf NW, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit Nicole Niederberger [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit Roman Niederberger];
Niederberger, Nicole, von Dallenwil, in Kriens, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit Ernst Niederberger.
Publication number: 5662610, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
NIBRU Immobilien AG, in Kriens, CH-100.3.784.830-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 10.07.2008, S. 9, Publ. 4567580).
Statutenänderung:
31.05.2010.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. [Weitere Aenderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 31.05.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lufida Revisions AG, in Luzern (CH-100.3.007.813-6), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.