Reports for NEXYR AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NEXYR AG
- NEXYR AG has its legal headquarters in Rotkreuz and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company NEXYR AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 28.12.2007.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 24.05.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.002.856.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Finance Diagnostics GmbH, Merz + Partners GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.12.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Risch
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.031.679-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.002.856
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten, Kaufen und Verkaufen von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmungen aller Art, von Wertschriften und Wertpapieren sowie von Patenten und anderen gewerblichen Schutzrechten; kann Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NICON TREUHAND AG | Hünenberg | 08.01.2008 | 23.05.2024 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- NEXYR Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: NEXYR AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006039017, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
NEXYR AG, in Risch, CHE-114.002.856, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 161 vom 22.08.2018, Publ. 4428067). Mit Erklärung vom 30.04.2024 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
NICON TREUHAND AG (CH-170.3.030.034-7), in Hünenberg, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4428067, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
NEXYR Holding AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-114.002.856, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 16.11.2016, Publ. 3165493).
Statutenänderung:
13.08.2018.
Firma neu:
NEXYR AG.
Sitz neu:
Risch.
Domizil neu:
Lindenmatt 5, 6343 Rotkreuz.
Aktien neu:
150 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 150 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[gestrichen: Sacheinlage: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung gemäss Sacheinlagevertrag vom 13.12.2007 einen Stammanteil der CubeServ GmbH, mit Sitz in Raunheim (DE), im Nennwert von EUR 12'250.00 und zum Übernahmepreis von CHF 150'000.00, wofür 150 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben werden.].
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Publikation im SHAB oder, sofern die Namen und Adressen sämtlicher Aktionäre bekannt sind, in schriftlicher Form. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Publication number: 3165493, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
NEXYR Holding AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-114.002.856, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 12.06.2013, Publ. 912701).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Merz, Roland, von Oberägeri, in Risch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Rotkreuz, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Rose, Jörg, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Mainz (DE), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.