Branches (1)
Reports for Nellen & Partner AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Nellen & Partner AG
- Nellen & Partner AG is currently active and the industry «Services regarding management consulting». The legal headquarters are in St. Gallen.
- The company was founded on 29.05.1998.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 11.01.2024.
- The company Nellen & Partner AG is registered under the UID CHE-106.838.605.
- There are currently 2 trademarks or applications for the company Nellen & Partner AG in the IPI database.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Claudia Nellen-Scheuner,
Jasmine Grabher,
Nicole Schmidt,
Roger Nellen-Scheuner
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.05.1998
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.044.537-3
UID/VAT
CHE-106.838.605
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unternehmensberatung sowie Rekrutieren und Vermitteln von Personal, Selektion von Führungskräften und Durchführung von Analysen für Dritte. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften kaufen, belehnen oder verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
die TreuhandExperten ag Herisau | Herisau | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
13.06.2018 | active | 50376/2018 | |
28.10.1998 | active | 04797/1998 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Nellen & Partner AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005931849, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Nellen & Partner AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-106.838.605, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 171 vom 03.09.2021, Publ. 1005283927).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kollhopp, Thomas, von Gossau ZH, in Illnau (Illnau-Effretikon), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nellen-Scheuner, Claudia, von Bitsch, in Amriswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005283927, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Nellen & Partner AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-106.838.605, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 16.03.2021, Publ. 1005125112).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grawehr, Madeleine Stefanie, von Gaiserwald, in Speicherschwendi (Speicher), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005125112, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Nellen & Partner AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-106.838.605, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 07.10.2019, Publ. 1004731634).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gemperli, Christian Fredi, von Oberuzwil, in Wil SG, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Limburg, Thomas Rolf, von Zürich, in Zollikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grabher, Jasmine, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Lustenau (AT), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.