Reports for Negi SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Negi SA
- Negi SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Fribourg. Negi SA belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 26.09.1988.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 21.12.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-101.510.468.
- On the same address there are 28 other active companies registered. These include: AURIEL SA, CMugny Sàrl, Constructor SA.
Management (4)
newest board members
Damien Joseph Marie Piller,
Mariette Agnès Savary-Grossrieder,
Rodolphe Rimaz,
Sylvie Elisabeth Vorlet
newest authorized signatories
Damien Joseph Marie Piller,
Mariette Agnès Savary-Grossrieder,
Rodolphe Rimaz,
Sylvie Elisabeth Vorlet
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.09.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Fribourg
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.136.021-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.510.468
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes opérations commerciales à caractère immobilier, soit le courtage, l'achat, la vente, la mise en valeur et la promotion de biens immobiliers, et d'une manière générale, de réaliser tant pour son compte que pour le compte de tiers toutes opérations financières, commerciales ou autres en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Véronique Dupré Fiduciaire SA | Fribourg | 08.10.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CRF Cabinet de Revision et de Fiscalité SA | Marly | <2004 | 07.10.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Negi SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005917037, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Negi S.A., à Fribourg, CHE-101.510.468 (FOSC du 08.10.2014, p. 0/1756241).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Fiduciaire Jean-Marc Etienne SA (CHE-104.004.078), organe de révision.
nouvelle raison sociale:
Véronique Dupré Fiduciaire SA (CHE-104.004.078).
Publication number: 1756241, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Negi S.A., à Granges-Paccot, CHE-101.510.468 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826). Siège transféré à Fribourg.
Nouvelle adresse:
Avenue du Midi 37, 1700 Fribourg.
Nouveau but:
toutes opérations commerciales à caractère immobilier, soit le courtage, l'achat, la vente, la mise en valeur et la promotion de biens immobiliers, et d'une manière générale, de réaliser tant pour son compte que pour le compte de tiers toutes opérations financières, commerciales ou autres en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but. Statuts modifiés le 29.09.2014. Fasel Gilbert n'est plus administrateur, sa signature est radiée. Piller Damien Joseph Marie, de Le Mouret, à Villars-sur-Glâne, est nommé administrateur et président, avec signature individuelle. Vorlet Sylvie Elisabeth, de Pont-en-Ogoz, à Villars-sur-Glâne, est nommée administratrice et secrétaire, Rimaz Rodolphe, de Ponthaux, à Autigny, est nommé administrateur, et Savary-Grossrieder Mariette Agnès, de Sâles, à Romont FR, est nommée administratrice, tous les trois avec signature collective à deux. CRF Cabinet de Revision et de Fiscalité S.A. (CH-217-0138519-5) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fiduciaire Jean-Marc Etienne SA CHE-104.004.078, à Friborug.
Publication number: 6016444, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Negi S.A., à Granges-Paccot, CH-217-0136021-6, toutes opérations commerciales à caractère immobilier, etc. (FOSC du 16.11.2009, p. 8). L'organe de révision inscrit CRF Cabinet de Revision et de Fiscalité S.A. (CH-217-0138519-5) est maintenant domicilié à Marly.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.