Reports for Nature's BioCeuticals (NBC) Group SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Nature's BioCeuticals (NBC) Group SA
- Nature's BioCeuticals (NBC) Group SA has its legal headquarters in Auboranges, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in food products».
- The company was founded on 14.10.2021 and has one person in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 17.11.2021.
- The reported UID is CHE-409.823.659.
- On the same address as Nature's BioCeuticals (NBC) Group SA there are 7 other active companies registered. These include: BALKAN INVEST SA, Botanical Trading Co SA, Executive Solutions Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.10.2021
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Auboranges
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.578.606-7
UID/VAT
CHE-409.823.659
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'achat et vente y compris l'importation et la distribution de produits naturels tels que les produits à base de chanvre industriel ainsi que le chanvre en lui-même. La société peut ouvrir des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, fonder ou acquérir toute entreprise poursuivant un but analogue ou complémentaire. La société peut accorder des prêts ou toutes garanties soit à ses associés soit à des tiers. La société peut faire, soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, industrielles, mobilières ou immobilières se rapportant directement ou indirectement à son but social.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Nature's BioCeuticals (NBC) Group SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005335906, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Nature's BioCeuticals (NBC) Group SA, à Auboranges, CHE-409.823.659 (FOSC du 19.10.2021, p. 0/1005315457).
Personne radiée:
Zen-Ruffinen Michael Thomas, administrateur, signature individuelle.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Susini François Jean Martin, de France, à Genève, administrateur, signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR01-1005315457, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Nature's BioCeuticals (NBC) Group SA, à Auboranges, Route du Moulin 43, 1673 Auboranges, CHE-409.823.659. Nouvelle société anonyme. Statuts du 12.10.2021.
But:
la société a pour but l'achat et vente y compris l'importation et la distribution de produits naturels tels que les produits à base de chanvre industriel ainsi que le chanvre en lui-même. La société peut ouvrir des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, fonder ou acquérir toute entreprise poursuivant un but analogue ou complémentaire. La société peut accorder des prêts ou toutes garanties soit à ses associés soit à des tiers. La société peut faire, soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, industrielles, mobilières ou immobilières se rapportant directement ou indirectement à son but social.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 50'000, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives. Restriction de transmissibilité des actions selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Personne inscrite:
Zen-Ruffinen Michael Thomas, de Sion, à Zermatt, administrateur, signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 12.10.2021, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.