Reports for NAG Immo GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NAG Immo GmbH
- NAG Immo GmbH with its legal headquarters in Schattdorf is a Limited liability company from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». NAG Immo GmbH is active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 06.10.2000.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 24.06.2021.
- In the commercial register the company NAG Immo GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-105.659.000.
- NAG Solar GmbH, Näpflin Gebäudehülle AG are registered at the same address.
Management (3)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Walter Gamma,
Brigitte Herger-Walker,
Rudolf Johann Zgraggen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.10.2000
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Schattdorf
Commercial Registry Office
UR
Commercial register number
CH-120.4.001.683-6
UID/VAT
CHE-105.659.000
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und den Verkauf von Liegenschaften sowie das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen. Ferner kann sie Gesellschaften, Grundstücke, Immobilien, Patente und Lizenzen errichten, erwerben, verwalten, halten und veräussern. Sie kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Baufor GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: NAG Immo GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005227101, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Baufor GmbH, in Seedorf (UR), CHE-105.659.000, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 06.08.2018, Publ. 4398357).
Statutenänderung:
15.06.2021.
Firma neu:
NAG Immo GmbH.
Sitz neu:
Schattdorf.
Domizil neu:
Rüttistrasse 67, 6467 Schattdorf.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und den Verkauf von Liegenschaften sowie das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen. Ferner kann sie Gesellschaften, Grundstücke, Immobilien, Patente und Lizenzen errichten, erwerben, verwalten, halten und veräussern. Sie kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Büeler, Rico Josef, von Schwyz, in Schattdorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gamma, Walter, von Schattdorf, in Schattdorf, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Herger-Walker, Brigitte, von Spiringen, in Bürglen (UR), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 40 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Zgraggen, Rudolf Johann, von Schattdorf, in Schattdorf, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 40 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.