Address
c/o Heinz Oberholzer
Sonnenblick 3
8824 Schönenberg ZH
Reports for Mythenhaus Stiftung des Turnvereins Neumünster Zürich
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Mythenhaus Stiftung des Turnvereins Neumünster Zürich
- Mythenhaus Stiftung des Turnvereins Neumünster Zürich is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Schönenberg ZH.
- The organization was founded on 30.12.1950.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 06.07.2022.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-110.382.672.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Hans Reiner,
Heinz Oberholzer,
Gabriela Rutschmann-Rathgeb,
Jürg Meier
newest authorized signatories
Hans Reiner,
Heinz Oberholzer,
Gabriela Rutschmann-Rathgeb,
Jürg Meier
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.12.1950
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Wädenswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.902.808-0
UID/VAT
CHE-110.382.672
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Stiftung ist die Förderung und Unterstützung von Aktivitäten im Rahmen des Invalidensportes, des Jugendsportes und verschiedener Formen des Alters- und Veteranenturnens, vornehmlich auf dem Gebiet der Stadt Zürich. Der Stifter (TVNZ) ist berechtigt, der Stiftung Vorschläge zur Ausrichtung von Fördergeldern zu unterbreiten. Die Stiftung verfolgt weder Erwerbs- noch Selbsthilfezwecke.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Honold Treuhand AG | Zürich | 09.08.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Mythenhaus Stiftung des Turnvereins Neumünster Zürich
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005513447, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mythenhaus Stiftung des Turnvereins Neumünster Zürich, in Wädenswil, CHE-110.382.672, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 15.01.2019, Publ. 1004541274).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht des Kantons Zürich (BVS) (CHE-239.560.630). [Eintrag auf Grund des geänderten Gesetzes über die BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (BVSG) vom 07.02.2022 sowie der Vereinbarung zwischen der Stadt Zürich und der BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht des Kantons Zürich (BVS) vom 19.05.2022.]
Publication number: HR02-1004541274, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mythenhaus Stiftung des Turnvereins Neumünster Zürich, in Schönenberg (ZH), CHE-110.382.672, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 18.04.2017, Publ. 3470427).
Sitz neu:
Wädenswil. Eintragung von Amtes wegen aufgrund der Fusion der Gemeinden Wädenswil, Schönenberg (ZH) und Hütten.
Publication number: 3470427, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mythenhaus Stiftung des Turnvereins Neumünster Zürich, in Küsnacht ZH, CHE-110.382.672, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2014, Publ. 1594015).
Sitz neu:
Schönenberg ZH.
Domizil neu:
c/o Heinz Oberholzer, Sonnenblick 3, 8824 Schönenberg ZH.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fischer, Hans Rudolf, von Zürich, in Küsnacht ZH, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oberholzer, Heinz, von Wald ZH, in Schönenberg ZH, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Reiner, Hans, von Zürich, in Volketswil, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Meier, Jürg, von Zürich, in Herrliberg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.