Reports for MVM Partners Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout MVM Partners Sàrl
- MVM Partners Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Monthey and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 23.10.2018.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company MVM Partners Sàrl is the following: CHE-115.131.195.
- Next to the company MVM Partners Sàrl there are 6 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Auteuil SA, Corten SA, MVM Project SA.
Management (3)
newest authorized signatories
Maxime Délez,
Vincent Christophe Rouiller-Monay,
Mathieu Kerneur
Executive board
Maxime Délez,
Vincent Christophe Rouiller-Monay,
Mathieu Kerneur
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.10.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Monthey
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.4.007.892-2
UID/VAT
CHE-115.131.195
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, vente, courtage, construction, aménagement, exploitation, location et gérance d'immeubles, ainsi que toute prestation dans le domaine fiduciaire et comptable; la société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir des biens mobiliers et immobiliers, acquérir des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue, ou fusionner avec de telles entreprises, faire toutes opérations et conclure tous contrats propres à développer et à étendre son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement; elle peut enfin également accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Mendes, Délez & Kerneur Immobilier Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: MVM Partners Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004482602, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Rectification de l'inscription au registre journalier no 235 du 25.01.2018, publiée dans la FOSC no 20 du 30.01.2018, publ. 4'024'239. MVM Partners Sàrl, à Monthey, CHE-115.131.195, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 20 du 30.01.2018, Publ. 4024239).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Délez, Maxime, de Vernayaz et Salvan, à Champéry, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 67 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [non: pour 66 parts sociales de CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 4024239, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
MVM Partners Sàrl, à Monthey, CHE-115.131.195, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 18 du 26.01.2018, Publ. 4018483).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
MDK Immobilier/Fiduciaire SA (CHE-113.929.242), à Champéry, associée, pour 134 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Kerneur, Mathieu, de Courtelary, à Monthey, associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 67 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: Kerneur, Mathieu, de Courtelary, à Monthey, associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 66 parts sociales de CHF 100.00];
Délez, Maxime, de Salvan et Vernayaz, à Champéry, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 66 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: Délez, Maxime, de Salvan et Vernayaz, à Champéry, gérant, avec signature collective à deux];
Rouiller-Monay, Vincent, de Troistorrents, à Salvan, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 66 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: Rouiller-Monay, Vincent, de Troistorrents, à Salvan, gérant, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: 4018483, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Mendes, Délez & Kerneur Immobilier Sàrl, à Monthey, CHE-115.131.195, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 87 du 07.05.2015, Publ. 2139927).
Modification des statuts:
19.12.2017.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
MVM Partners Sàrl.
Nouveau but:
achat, vente, courtage, construction, aménagement, exploitation, location et gérance d'immeubles, ainsi que toute prestation dans le domaine fiduciaire et comptable;
la société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir des biens mobiliers et immobiliers, acquérir des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue, ou fusionner avec de telles entreprises, faire toutes opérations et conclure tous contrats propres à développer et à étendre son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement;
elle peut enfin également accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Mendes de Leon, Luis, de Champéry, à Champéry, gérant et président, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Kerneur, Mathieu, de Courtelary, à Monthey, associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 66 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux];
MDK Immobilier/Fiduciaire SA (CHE-113.929.242), à Champéry, associée, pour 134 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: Mendes & Délez SA (CH-621.3.007.158-4)];
Délez, Maxime, de Salvan et Vernayaz, à Champéry, gérant, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: gérant et secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux];
Rouiller-Monay, Vincent, de Troistorrents, à Salvan, gérant, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.