Reports for Mountain Capital Management AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Mountain Capital Management AG
- Mountain Capital Management AG has its legal headquarters in Wädenswil and is active. It operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting».
- The company was founded on 31.07.2006 and has 4 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 26.10.2022. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company Mountain Capital Management AG is registered under the UID CHE-113.044.065.
Management (4)
newest board members
Christine Elisabeth Susanne Schmitz-Riol,
Manfred Boersch,
Daniel Sebastian Charlo Wenzel
newest authorized signatories
Luisa Kauter,
Christine Elisabeth Susanne Schmitz-Riol,
Manfred Boersch,
Daniel Sebastian Charlo Wenzel
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.07.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wädenswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.030.098-8
UID/VAT
CHE-113.044.065
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen an sowie die Beratung von Unternehmen in den Bereichen Management, Finanzwesen, Organisation und Administration. Die Gesellschaft kann zudem Beteiligungen an Unternehmen halten, verwalten, erwerben und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann ferner alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich im In- und Ausland an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, solche erwerben oder mit solchen fusionieren. Sie kann Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Immobilien und Lizenzen erwerben, belasten, verwalten oder veräussern sowie in irgendeiner Form Patente, Marken, Designrechte, Urheberrechte sowie andere gewerbliche Schutzrechte erwerben, verwerten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revisal AG Gossau | Gossau (SG) | 28.06.2011 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 29.05.2007 | 27.06.2011 | |
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 07.08.2006 | 28.05.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Mönchsberg AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Mountain Capital Management AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005591019, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mountain Capital Management AG, in Wädenswil, CHE-113.044.065, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 02.10.2019, Publ. 1004728026).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Köhler, Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Horgen, mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kauter, Luisa, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Horgen, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1004728026, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mountain Capital Management AG, in Wädenswil, CHE-113.044.065, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 26.02.2013, S.0, Publ. 7079292).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmitz-Riol, Christine Elisabeth Susanne, von Horgen, in Kilchberg (ZH), Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: deutsche Staatsangehörige].
Publication number: 7079292, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mountain Capital Management AG, in Wädenswil, CH-020.3.030.098-8, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 11.10.2011, Publ. 6371252).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Halbherr, Ralf, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Konstanz (DE), mit Einzelprokura.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.